Mekni v. Covidien LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:22-md-03029
Lead case: 1:22-md-03029
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Patti B Saris |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10716 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:24-cv-00483 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:23 PM EDT |
Defendant
Covidien L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Sofradim Production SAS
|
|
Plaintiff
Annette Mekni
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice re: MDL Case Transferred
Thu 03/21 3:02 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number 15 entered in MDL No. 3029, District of Minnesota case number 0:24-cv-00483 has been transferred to the District of Massachusetts and assigned civil action number: 1:24-cv-10716. In Re: Covidien Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation No. II, MDL 3029 (Danieli, Chris) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/21 3:01 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 03/21 2:59 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:24-cv-00483. |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) transferring case to the District of Massachusetts per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Patti B. Saris.(CLK) | |
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #3029 re:1 Complaint. (MMG) | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Covidien LP, Sofradim Production SAS. (MMG) | |
2 | 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-483 JMB/DTS. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10845441) filed by Annette Mekni. Filer requests summons issued. (Johnson, Charles) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |