California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:24-cv-02321
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Sep 18, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24STCV02271
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Radix Group International, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher J Boman
Fisher And Phillips LLP
contact info
Shannon Cahill
Holland And Knight LLP
contact info
Lisa L Peterson
Fisher And Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Laurie Nathan
Represented By
James B Hardin
Hardin Law Group Apc
contact info
Brent S. Buchsbaum
Law Offices Of Buchsbaum And Haag LLP
contact info
Laurel N Haag
Law Offices Of Buchsbaum And Haag LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
21 21 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/18 5:16 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. filed a stipulation of dismissal, (ECF No.20 ), which is effective to close the case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The case is therefore closed. (JS-6). Accordingly, the Court STRIKES the proposed order (ECF No.20 -1) as moot, and all pending dates are vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
20 20 stip Dismiss Case Tue 09/17 1:42 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by defendant Radix Group International, Inc..(Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
19 19 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 04/30 5:01 PM
CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2025 at 3:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Jury Trial set for 4/28/2025 at 8:30 AM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
18 18 12 pgs order Order Tue 04/30 4:55 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (iv)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Tue 04/30 4:52 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 04/25 9:32 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the May 1, 2024, Scheduling Conference. Trial Order to be issued. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 04/18 9:52 AM
NOTICE TO FILER RE DEFICIENCY by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed at ECF No.14 does not comply with he Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conference as the parties are required to email the text-fillable worksheet to Judge Garnetts chambers SPG_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. The worksheet is due by April 18, 2024. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
14 14 misc Report Wed 04/17 11:33 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Report filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc.. (Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 03/27 3:22 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/17/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/27 2:40 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/26 9:32 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/26 9:31 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/26 9:31 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
8 8 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 03/21 3:47 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. dba DHL Global Forwarding (Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Related Case(s) Thu 03/21 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. dba DHL Global Forwarding. (Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/21 3:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. dba DHL Global Forwarding, (Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/21 3:01 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. dba DHL Global Forwarding (Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/21 2:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. dba DHL Global Forwarding. (Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Thu 03/21 2:50 PM
DECLARATION of Christa Johnson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. dba DHL Global Forwarding. (Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Thu 03/21 2:46 PM
DECLARATION of Lisa L. Peterson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. dba DHL Global Forwarding.(Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/21 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV02271 Receipt No: ACACDC-37139910 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. dba DHL Global Forwarding. (Attorney Lisa L Peterson added to party Radix Group International, Inc. dba DHL Global Forwarding(pty:dft))(Peterson, Lisa)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 03/26 9:12 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Laurie Nathan in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/29/2024, attached to Peterson Decl. as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 03/26 9:20 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Radix Group International, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/21/2024, attached to Peterson Decl. as Exhibit 4. (jtil)
Related: [-]