Roybal et al v. Brownridge et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Kea W Riggs |
Referred: | Jerry H Ritter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00277 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Tenth Judicial District Court, D-1010-CV-23-00076 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:27 PM MDT |
Defendant
Berkley Regional Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronald Brownridge
|
|
Defendant
Nitrogen Solutions, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Roseann Roybal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Roybal
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 1 pgs ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs DENYING as moot5 Motion to Dismiss. (gr) | |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Wilson, Lisa) | |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
Summons Issued as to Ronald Brownridge, Nitrogen Solutions, LLC. (bc) | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 8 and 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE by Roseann Roybal, Steve Roybal re5 MOTION to Dismiss of Extension of Time to File Response (Woods, Jonathan) | |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Berkley Regional Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Wilson, Lisa) | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Roseann Roybal voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Woods, Jonathan) | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) and considering the pending dispositive motion, the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (atc) | ||
ORDER Finding Good Cause to Delay Issuance of Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Defendant Berkley Regional Insurance Company's5 MOTION to Dismiss may be dispositive of some claims and, if granted, would eliminate the need for some discovery. Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), I thus find good cause to delay issuance of a scheduling order in this case until the motion is resolved. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (sjl) | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Berkley Regional Insurance Company. (Wilson, Lisa) | |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 DECLARATION FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Wilson, Lisa) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE by Berkley Regional Insurance Company of Certificate of Notice of Removal (Wilson, Lisa) | |
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkley Regional Insurance Company from Quay County District Court, case number D-1010-CV-2023-00076. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company.(Wilson, Lisa) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Index of Documents, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Acceptance of Service | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (eh) | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number BNMDC-9275527 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wilson, Lisa) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) |