Tumminaro v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Damian L Martinez |
Referred: | Gregory J Fouratt |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00278 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Twelfth Judicial District Court, D-1215-CV-24-00071 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:27 PM MDT |
Defendant
Liberty Insurance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Tumminaro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Kaselonis, Taryn) | |
ORDER STAYING CASE, VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, AND FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTERING A SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Court grants6 Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings and stays all proceedings and deadlines through 7/10/2024, to allow the parties to engage in settlement negotiations. The Court hereby vacate its5 Initial Scheduling Order and associated deadlines and finds good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 to delay entering a scheduling order. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2024, is also vacated. The parties shall file a status report before the expiration of the stay to inform the Court of the status of settlement negotiations. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (am) | ||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 4/30/2024 at 10:00 AM. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 4/23/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/11/2024. (am) | |
4 | 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | |
3 | 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Kaselonis, Taryn) | |
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Insurance Corporation (Kaselonis, Taryn) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Insurance Corporation from Twelfth Judicial District Court, Sandoval County, State of New Mexico, case number D-1215-cv-2024-00071. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Kaselonis, Taryn) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9275381 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaselonis, Taryn) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (eh) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) |