Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Lori V Vaughan |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-01376 |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.
5250 International Dr Ste D22
Orlando, FL 32819-9411 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Wed 05/01 10:45 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain Chad Van Horn And Van Horn Law Group, P.A. as Attorney for Debtor. Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc. . (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Tue 04/30 4:46 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 21 - 31, 2024 Filed by Julia Anne Osmolia on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.. (Osmolia, Julia Anne) |
|
38 | 38
misc
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
Tue 04/30 2:50 PM
Schedule E/F,Schedule G, Includes addition or deletion of creditors, or executory contract entity/leaseholders, or co-debtors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. (Verify Fee) Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Tue 04/30 4:43 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)([LINK:6:24-bk-01376-LVV] ) [misc,schaja] ( 34.00). Receipt Number A75273619, Amount Paid $ 34.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 04/28 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order on Application to Employ/Retain
Thu 04/25 2:22 PM
Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain Chad Van Horn And Van Horn Law Group, P.A. as Attorney for Debtor . Service Instructions: Chad Van Horn is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lisa P.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Application to Employ/Retain
Mon 04/22 8:58 AM
|
|
trustee
(NO PAPER) - Chapter 11 - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded
Mon 04/22 1:53 PM
The United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on 4/22/2024 . Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Kelso, Jill) |
||
trustee
(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Non-Appointment of Creditors' Committee
Mon 04/22 1:53 PM
Until further notice, the United States Trustee will not appoint a committee of creditors pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1102. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Kelso, Jill) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Fri 04/19 9:47 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice and Order Scheduling Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Relief From Stay. Filed by Michael Dunn on behalf of Creditor Dezer Orlando Center, LLC . (Dunn, Michael) |
|
33 | 33
order
Notice and Order Scheduling Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Relief from the Stay
Fri 04/19 8:38 AM
Notice and Order Scheduling Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Relief from the Stay by Dezer Orlando Center, LLC . Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2024 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Michael Dunn is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Motion for Relief from Stay (not for amended motions)
Wed 04/17 4:54 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay. (Verify Fee) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 04/17 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael Dunn on behalf of Creditor Dezer Orlando Center, LLC. (Dunn, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Wed 04/17 4:56 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK:6:24-bk-01376-LVV] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A75136212, Amount Paid $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Saturday, April 06, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Sat 04/06 8:58 AM
Certificate of Service Re: (1) Interim Order Granting Motion Seeking Authority to Use Cash Collateral as of March 21, 2024 and to Make Adequate Protection Payments to Caymus Funding Inc. (DE 28); and (2) Interim Order Granting Emergency Motion to Impose Automatic Stay (DE 29). Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc. . (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 04/05 11:14 AM
Interim Order Granting Emergency Motion to Impose Automatic Stay . Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2024 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Julia Anne Osmolia, Esq is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nadia) Modified on 4/5/2024 (Nadia) |
|
28 | 28
4
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 04/05 11:08 AM
Interim Order Granting Emergency Motion Seeking Authority to Use Cash Collateral as of March 21, 2024 and to Make Adequate Protection Payments to Caymus Funding Inc . Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2024 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Julia Anne Osmolia, Esq is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nadia) Modified on 4/5/2024 (Nadia) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 04/05 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 04/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Tue 04/02 1:16 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/22/2024 at 01:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 5/30/2024. (Faye) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (BK)
Sat 03/30 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing . Notice Date 03/29/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition
Thu 03/28 8:26 AM
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
Notice of Hearing / Status Conference / Reaffirmation Hearing
Wed 03/27 12:29 PM
Notice of Initial Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2024 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Aimee) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
court
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
Tue 03/26 5:22 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Julia Osmolia: Debtor; Audrey Aleskovsky: UST RULING: ~1) Debtor's Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral as of March 21, 2024 and, Motion for Adequate Protection Payments to Caymus Funding Inc. (Doc #4) - Granted on an interim basis thru 4/30/24; Continued hearing scheduled 4/30/2024 at 3:00pm. Order by Osmolia. ~2) Debtor's Emergency Motion to Impose Automatic Stay (Doc #6) - Granted on an interim basis thru 4/30/24; Continued hearing scheduled 4/30/2024 at 3:00pm. Order by Osmolia. (aj) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Application to Employ/Retain
Tue 03/26 4:53 PM
|
|
20 | 20
misc
Statement of Operations for Small Business
Tue 03/26 2:53 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Balance Sheet
Tue 03/26 2:48 PM
Balance Sheet Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Tue 03/26 10:40 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Granting Ex-Parte Motion for Debtor's Counsel to Appear Remote at Emergency Hearing. Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc. . (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Tax Documents
Tue 03/26 10:08 AM
Tax Documents for the Year 2022 Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
16 | 16
order
Allow
Tue 03/26 9:13 AM
Order Granting Motion To Allow Remote Appearance of Debtor's Counsel at Emergency Hearing on Tuesday, March 26, 2024 . Service Instructions: Chad Van Horn is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Andre) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Motion to Allow
Mon 03/25 3:58 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Allow Remote Appearance of Debtor's Counsel at Emergency Hearing on Tuesday, March 26, 2024 Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc. |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certificate Of Service (BK)
Mon 03/25 3:17 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc. . (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Mon 03/25 2:56 PM
Notice of Hearing on Emergency Motion to Impose Automatic Stay Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc. . Hearing scheduled for 3/26/2024 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Mon 03/25 2:55 PM
Notice of Hearing on Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral as of March 21, 2024 and, Motion for Adequate Protection Payments to Caymus Funding Inc. Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc. . Hearing scheduled for 3/26/2024 at 03:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only)
Mon 03/25 7:51 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Jill E Kelso on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Kelso, Jill) |
|
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Mon 03/25 10:41 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 03/26/2024 3:00pm Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral as of March 21, 2024 and, Motion for Adequate Protection Payments to Caymus Funding Inc. Doc4 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Chad T Van Horn to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Mon 03/25 10:41 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 03/26/2024 3:00pm Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Emergency Motion to Impose Automatic Stay Doc6 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Chad T Van Horn to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
court
Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)
Mon 03/25 10:49 AM
Prior Bankruptcy Case(s): Case Number 6:23-bk-05387-LVV, Ch. 11 filed 12/20/2023, Dismissed 3/8/2024 . (Aimee) |
||
Saturday, March 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 03/24 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 03/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Fri 03/22 6:13 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Balance Sheet, Certificate of Resolution . (Vivianne) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Necessity (BK)
Fri 03/22 4:52 PM
Certificate of Necessity Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc. . (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Necessity (BK)
Fri 03/22 4:48 PM
Certificate of Necessity Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc. . (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Motion to Impose/Reimpose Automatic Stay
Fri 03/22 4:43 PM
|
|
5 | 5
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Fri 03/22 4:02 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
4 | 4
10
pgs
motion
Motion for Adequate Protection (not for use w/motion for relief w/alternative request for adeq. prot
Fri 03/22 3:49 PM
|
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Thu 03/21 4:57 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Thu 03/21 3:56 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Debtor Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
1 | 1
38
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 03/21 3:54 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Summary of Assets, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation, Filed by Chad T Van Horn on behalf of Perfectos Cigar Lounge, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan & Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2024. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Thu 03/21 4:01 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-01376] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A74876603, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Thu 03/21 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |