California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-02327
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
TSJ Distributors INC
Represented By
Jason L. Haas
Ervin Cohen And Jessup LLP
contact info
Catherine A Veeneman
Ervin Cohen And Jessup LLP
contact info
David N Tarlow
Ervin Cohen And Jessup LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stache Products, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Laurence Rollin
Sriplaw PA
contact info
Layla T. Nguyen
Sriplaw PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 11, 2024
24 24 stip Dismiss Case Fri 10/11 2:31 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC.(Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
23 23 order Staying Case Thu 09/12 6:50 PM
ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 9/10/2024, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc.17 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed and that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 10/10/2024. Until the Dismissal Date, the Court retains full jurisdiction over this action. Any outstanding Orders to Show Cause are discharged. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
22 22 notice Settlement Thu 08/22 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) filed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
21 21 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Mon 08/19 12:14 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 09/26/2025. (cr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/29 4:44 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER IN A PATENT CASE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Doc.19 ) and VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2024. The Court sets the schedule in this case as set forth below. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 10/1/2024. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 7/25/2025. Last Day to File Dispositive Motions: 8/8/2025. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 8/8/2025. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 9/5/2025. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 9/26/2025. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 10/3/2025. Last Day to File Daubert Motions: 10/10/2025. Last Day to File Motions in Limine: 10/31/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2025 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
19 19 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 07/19 10:16 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC.. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
18 18 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/18 1:56 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: GRANTING17 Non-Resident Attorney Layla T. Nguyen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stache Peoducts LLC, designating Matrhew L. Rollin as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lt)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 07/18 10:05 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Layla T. Nguyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-37855872) filed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
16 16 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 06/05 3:17 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (cr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
15 15 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 05/31 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, (Tarlow, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/31 2:37 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,13 filed by Defendant TSJ Distributors INC.(Tarlow, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
13 13 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 05/17 1:49 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant TSJ Distributors INC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC(Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - USPN 10786006,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- USPN 11497244,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - USPN 11497252,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - USPN D872933,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - RIG IN ONE Trademark Registration
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 04/23 3:46 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TSJ Distributors INC answer now due 5/17/2024, filed by Defendant TSJ Distributors INC.(Attorney David N Tarlow added to party TSJ Distributors INC(pty:dft))(Tarlow, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 04/02 9:47 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC, upon Defendant TSJ Distributors INC served on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Devendra Munyal - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/25 4:21 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/22 1:12 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant TSJ Distributors INC. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/22 1:11 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/22 1:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/22 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
5 5 notice Summons Request Thu 03/21 1:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Thu 03/21 1:32 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Stache Products, LLC. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/21 1:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC, (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/21 1:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/21 1:26 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37139867 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Stache Products, LLC. (Attorney Matthew Laurence Rollin added to party Stache Products, LLC(pty:pla))(Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - USPN 10786006,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- USPN 11497244,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - USPN 11497252,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - USPN D872933,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - RIG IN ONE Trademark Registration