Salyers v. Builder Services Group, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John E Steele |
Referred: | Nicholas P Mizell |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00260 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:19 PM EDT |
Defendant
Builder Services Group, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Salyers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/25 2:53 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Builder Services Group, Inc. (JTM) |
|
6 | 6
order
Civil Action Order
Mon 03/25 10:34 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/25/2024. (WRW) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/22 4:09 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-260-JES-NPM. (AA) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 03/21 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Benjamin H. Yormak on behalf of Rodney Salyers. Lead Counsel: Benjamin H. Yormak, Esq.. (Yormak, Benjamin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/21 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rodney Salyers. (Yormak, Benjamin) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 03/21 3:33 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rodney Salyers. Related case(s): No (Yormak, Benjamin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Builder Services Group, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21896955) filed by Rodney Salyers.(Yormak, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |