Bright v. Clark et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Philip R Lammens |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00143 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons issued
Wed 04/24 3:06 PM
SUMMONS issued as to FNU Clark and FNU Coleman. (KLS) |
|
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order to Answer
Wed 04/24 1:51 PM
ORDER TO ANSWER and Notice to Plaintiff. The United States Marshal or Deputy United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Complaint (Doc. 1), and this Order upon the Defendants within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to provide the necessary documents to United States Marshal for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/24/2024. (KLS) Modified text on 4/24/2024 (KLS) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
utility
*Remark
Mon 04/22 1:29 PM
Received completed Summons and USM-285 forms with service copies for each defendant. (KLS) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order to complete service forms
Thu 03/28 10:21 AM
ORDER to complete service forms. Plaintiff is directed to return forms and 2 identical copies of 1 Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff blank summons forms and blank USM-285 forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/28/2024. (KLS) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/26 4:05 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay initial partial filing fee of $0.00. Plaintiff is assessed the total $350 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Supervisor, Inmate Trust Funds at Plaintiff's current place of incarceration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/26/2024. (KLS) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants
Thu 03/21 3:56 PM
STANDING ORDER for all confined pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/21/2024. (RLK) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner consent form and financial certificate
Thu 03/21 3:52 PM
PRISONER consent form and financial certificate by Carnell Bright. (RLK) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/21 3:50 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Carnell Bright. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against FNU Clark, FNU Coleman with Jury Demand filed by Carnell Bright. (no fees paid, no service copies provided)(RLK) |