Goffman v. Auto Club South Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Anne C Conway |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00554 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 42:4072 Payment of Flood Insurance Claim |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:20 PM EDT |
Defendant
Auto Club South Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Goffman
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 4:21 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by David Goffman. (Tomlinson, Brandon) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order to Strike
Thu 04/11 9:54 AM
ORDER to Strike re: 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by David Goffman. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a compliant Disclosure Statement within 7 days. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/10/2024. (KLD) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 9:49 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by David Goffman. (Tomlinson, Brandon) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 9:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested Persons Order by David Goffman. (Tomlinson, Brandon) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/09 9:36 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brandon Joel Tomlinson on behalf of David Goffman. Lead Counsel: Brandon Joel Tomlinson. (Tomlinson, Brandon) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/02 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John A. Unzicker, Jr on behalf of Auto Club South Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: John A. Unzicker, Jr.. (Unzicker, John) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/29 8:50 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/28 12:59 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Auto Club South Insurance Company.(Unzicker, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 03/26 3:33 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/26/2024. (KLD) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/26 7:31 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/26/2024. (JOR) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/22 9:24 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-554-ACC-EJK. (ARL) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/21 5:15 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Auto Club South Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Auto Club Group for Auto Club South Insurance Company.. (Unzicker, John) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/21 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9th Judicial Circuit in and for Osceola County, Florida, case number 2024-CA-000476-OC filed in State Court on 02/15/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21897847 filed by Auto Club South Insurance Company.(Unzicker, John) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Dec Page, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |