Allen v. ITSA Solutions, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William F Jung |
Referred: | Christopher P Tuite |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00719 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:21 PM EDT |
Defendant
James Denny, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Colin Heffron, Sr.
|
|
Defendant
Colin Heffron, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Robert Hendricks
|
|
Defendant
ITSA Solutions, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Prashnat Naik
|
|
Defendant
Teresa Sai
|
|
Plaintiff
Rashawn Allen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/26 2:11 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Waiver of service executed
Thu 04/25 3:36 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/22/2024 by Rashawn Allen as to Teresa Sai. (Estes, Sean) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of service executed
Thu 04/25 3:34 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/22/2024 by Rashawn Allen as to Robert Hendricks. (Estes, Sean) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of service executed
Thu 04/25 3:33 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/22/2024 by Rashawn Allen Waiver of Service sent on 04/04/2024 as to Prashnat Naik. (Estes, Sean) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of service executed
Thu 04/25 3:29 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/22/2024 by Rashawn Allen as to ITSA Solutions, LLC. (Estes, Sean) |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of service executed
Thu 04/25 3:27 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/22/2024 by Rashawn Allen as to Colin Heffron, Sr. (Estes, Sean) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of service executed
Thu 04/25 3:24 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/22/2024 by Rashawn Allen as to Colin Heffron, Jr. (Estes, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 12:40 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rashawn Allen. (Estes, Sean) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 04/03 10:06 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rashawn Allen. Related case(s): No (Estes, Sean) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Appointing Mediator
Fri 03/29 10:17 AM
ORDER appointing Jeffrey Carter Andersen as mediator in this action. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required absent Court order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/29/2024. (CCB) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
misc
Disbursement Voucher / Refund
Wed 03/27 11:55 AM
REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-21897857 refunded in the amount of $ $405.00 paid to Sean Estes.. (NLC) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 03/25 8:18 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 03/25 8:17 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/22 1:30 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-719-WFJ-CPT. (TNP) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21897924) filed by Rashawn Allen.(Estes, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |