New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Referred: Sarah L Cave
Case #: 1:24-cv-02134
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
M. Richard Cutler
Counter Defendant
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
Represented By
Lori Marks-Esterman
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
contact info
Kerrin Teneyck Klein
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
M. Richard Cutler
Cross Defendant
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
Represented By
Lori Marks-Esterman
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
contact info
Kerrin Teneyck Klein
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
contact info
Defendant
M. Richard Cutler
Defendant
Randall J. Lanham
Defendant
Christopher R. Riley
6575 West Loop South Suite 500
Bellaire, TX 77401
Defendant
The Committee to Restore NYMOX Shareholder Value Inc.
Plaintiff
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
Represented By
Lori Marks-Esterman
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
contact info
Kerrin Teneyck Klein
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Tue 04/22 12:47 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 82. Mailed to: Christopher R. Riley 6575 West Loop South Suite 500 Bellaire, TX 77401. (nb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
82 82 order Memo Endorsement Mon 04/21 11:26 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:81 Letter Court's Order dated April 11, 2025 (Dkt. No. 79) filed by Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP. ENDORSEMENT : All discovery is deemed closed. The parties are referred to the Honorable Andrew L. Carter's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases for dispositive motions and trial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 4/21/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
81 81 misc Letter Fri 04/18 4:07 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Kerrin T. Klein dated 04/18/2025 re: Courts Order dated April 11, 2025 (Dkt. No. 79).. Document filed by Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP..(Klein, Kerrin)
Related: [-]
misc Received Returned Mail Tue 04/22 10:14 AM
Received returned mail re:76 Protective Order. Mail was addressed to Christopher R. Riley, 6575 West Loop South, Suite 500, Bellaire, TX 77401 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return To Sender Not Deliverable As Addressed Unable To Forward, UNDELIVERABLE. (vn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
80 80 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 04/17 11:37 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP..(Klein, Kerrin)
Related: [-]