Hyden-Subichin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrell A Clay |
Referred: | Darrell A Clay |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00532 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Consent to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/01 10:06 AM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/1/2024. (K,K) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 04/01 10:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge Dan Aaron Polster terminated. Related document6 . (H,Ch) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy
Mon 03/25 11:23 AM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Ke) |
|
4 | 4
order
Magistrate Judges Initial Order
Mon 03/25 11:22 AM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 calendar days after notice of the complaint is served on it to file the certified transcript of the administrative record. Plaintiff must file its Brief on the Merits within 45 calendar days of the filing of the Administrative Transcript. If Plaintiff's Brief on the Merits is not filed within 45 calendar days after the Administrative Transcript, the case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution without further notice. Defendant's Brief on the Merits must be filed within 45 calendar days thereafter. Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's Brief. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/25/2024. (R,Ke) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order
Thu 03/21 4:08 PM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. (P,G) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (atty event)
Thu 03/21 3:54 PM
Notice of Service of Social Security Number filed by Joan E. Hyden-Subichin. (McDaniel, Eric) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 3:45 PM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12470066.. Filed by Joan E. Hyden-Subichin. (McDaniel, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Thu 03/21 4:02 PM
Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (P,G) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/21 4:04 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (P,G) |
||
oth_evt
Notice of Social Security Complaint
Thu 03/21 4:05 PM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (P,G) |
||
order
Automatic Reference of Administrative Action
Thu 03/21 4:13 PM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/21/2024. (P,G) |