California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:24-cv-02331
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
City of San Bernardino
Represented By
Aamir Raza
Lawrence Beach Allen And Choi PC
contact info
Paul B Beach
Lawrence Beach Allen And Choi PC
contact info
Defendant
Officer M. Mckray
Represented By
Aamir Raza
Lawrence Beach Allen And Choi PC
contact info
Paul B Beach
Lawrence Beach Allen And Choi PC
contact info
Defendant
Officer J. Rosales
Represented By
Aamir Raza
Lawrence Beach Allen And Choi PC
contact info
Paul B Beach
Lawrence Beach Allen And Choi PC
contact info
Defendant
DOE Officers
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Richard T. Copeland
Represented By
Richard T Copeland
Conflict Solution Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Audi Osborne
Represented By
Gregory Levon Kirakosian
Kirakosian Law Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamika Tate
Represented By
Gregory Levon Kirakosian
Kirakosian Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 05/09 9:44 AM
ORDER RE: 1) DISMISSING SUIT WITH PREJUDICE; AND 2) WAIVING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case18 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that pursuant to the Stipulation of the Parties, (ECF No. 18), and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is DISMISSED in its entirety WITH PREJUDICE, including all of Plaintiff's claims as to all current and former Defendants, as well as Defendants' past, present and future employers, supervisors, directors, attorneys, agents, subordinates, predecessors, and successors in interest and assigns, and all other persons, firms, or corporations with whom any of the former have been, are now, or may hereafter be affiliated. IT IS FURTHER DECREED that each party has waived all claims for attorneys' fees and costs under 42 U.S.C. 1988 and any other provision of law. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
18 18 stip Dismiss Case Wed 05/07 8:40 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP, Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants City of San Bernardino, M. Mckray, J. Rosales.(Raza, Aamir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
17 17 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Wed 07/10 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard T. Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (cp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
16 16 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Tue 07/09 12:08 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Defendant City of San Bernardino(Raza, Aamir)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
15 15 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Tue 06/18 2:37 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (lc)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/18 2:35 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2025 01:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 7/8/2025 09:00 AM; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 6/30/2025 at 01:30 PM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 06/17 2:20 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 Days (not including Jury Selection), filed by Plaintiffs Audi Osborne, Tamika Tate.. (Kirakosian, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
12 12 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/23 1:06 PM
ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for July 1, 2024 at 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/22 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of San Bernardino, M. Mckray, J. Rosales, (Attorney Paul B Beach added to party City of San Bernardino(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B Beach added to party M. Mckray(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B Beach added to party J. Rosales(pty:dft))(Beach, Paul)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/22 3:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants City of San Bernardino, M. Mckray, J. Rosales.(Attorney Aamir Raza added to party City of San Bernardino(pty:dft), Attorney Aamir Raza added to party M. Mckray(pty:dft), Attorney Aamir Raza added to party J. Rosales(pty:dft))(Raza, Aamir)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 03/27 2:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submitdocuments electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/26 2:27 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants City of San Bernardino, M. Mckray, and J. Rosales. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/26 1:38 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/26 1:38 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/26 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/21 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Audi Osborne, Tamika Tate, identifying Plaintiffs are Individuals residing in Los Angeles, Defendants Rosales and Mckray are Officers for the City of San Bernardino. (Kirakosian, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 03/21 2:13 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Audi Osborne, Tamika Tate. (Kirakosian, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/21 2:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Audi Osborne. (Kirakosian, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/21 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37140516 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Tamika Tate, Audi Osborne. (Attorney Gregory Levon Kirakosian added to party Audi Osborne(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Levon Kirakosian added to party Tamika Tate(pty:pla))(Kirakosian, Gregory)
Related: [-]