HCC Manufacturing, LLC v. ROBINSON et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy E Brasel |
Referred: | Elizabeth Cowan Wright |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01013 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 6:16 PM CDT |
Defendant
Capital Avenue Corporation
|
|
Defendant
JEFFREY A. ROBINSON
|
|
Plaintiff
HCC Manufacturing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by HCC Manufacturing, LLC. Capital Avenue Corporation served on 4/5/2024, answer due 4/26/2024. (Rabuse, Dwight) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 04/16 11:31 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by HCC Manufacturing, LLC as to Capital Avenue Corporation. (Rabuse, Dwight) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 11:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by HCC Manufacturing, LLC. Jeffrey A. Robinson served on 4/3/2024, answer due 4/24/2024. (Rabuse, Dwight) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/27 2:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Capital Avenue Corporation, Jeffrey A. Robinson. (MMP) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/27 1:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Capital Avenue Corporation, Jeffrey A. Robinson. filed by HCC Manufacturing, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Rabuse, Dwight) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 03/25 3:47 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/25/2024. (SK) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Capital Avenue Corporation, Jeffrey A. Robinson. (LTT) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 03/22 9:39 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-1013 NEB/ECW. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/21 3:28 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for HCC Manufacturing, LLC. (Rabuse, Dwight) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Capital Avenue Corporation, JEFFREY A. ROBINSON (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10922544) filed by HCC Manufacturing, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Rabuse, Dwight) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |