Pipe Trades Services Minnesota, Inc. v. Carrier Global Corporation
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry W Blackwell |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01015 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 6:16 PM CDT |
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Pipe Trades Services Minnesota, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 04/11 2:36 PM
(Text-Only) Order: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) and for good cause shown, the Court APPROVES the parties'5 Joint Stipulation for Extension of time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond on or before May 13, 2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 4/11/2024.(JC) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Wed 04/10 9:06 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Carrier Global Corporation. Jointly Signed by Pipe Trades Services Minnesota, Inc.. (Anderson, Keith) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith S Anderson on behalf of Carrier Global Corporation. (Anderson, Keith) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/21 4:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Carrier Global Corporation. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 03/21 4:22 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 24-cv-1015 JWB/DJF. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kt) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Carrier Global Corporation d/b/a Carrier Commercial Service (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10922550) filed by Pipe Trades Services Minnesota, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Drentlaw, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |