Credit Lending Services, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Julia W Brand |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-12182 |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Credit Lending Services, Inc.
335 N 3rd St
Burbank, CA 91502-1115 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
61 | 61
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Fri 04/26 7:58 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order Denying The Park National Bank's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice, with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Credit Lending Services, Inc. . (Terzian, Tamar) |
|
60 | 60
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Fri 04/26 7:50 PM
Notice of lodgment of Final Order Authorizing Debtor the Use of Cash Collateral Order Denying Payment to Critical Vendors, with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Credit Lending Services, Inc. . (Terzian, Tamar) |
|
59 | 59
notice
Notice of motion/application
Fri 04/26 7:25 PM
Notice of motion/application Notice of Application of Credit Lending Services, Inc., Debtor, and Debtor in Possession to Employ Hanson Bridgett LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel, with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Credit Lending Services, Inc. . (Terzian, Tamar) |
|
58 | 58
motion
Employ (motion)
Fri 04/26 4:15 PM
Application to Employ Hanson Bridgett LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel Application of Credit Lending Services, Inc., Debtor, and Debtor in Possession to Employ Hanson Bridgett LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel; Declaration of Tamar Terzian in Support Thereof, with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Credit Lending Services, Inc. (Terzian, Tamar) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
57 | 57
answer
Opposition
Thu 04/25 6:44 PM
Opposition to Debtor Credit Lending Services, Inc. Response to Objection by The Park National Bank to Subchapter V Eligibility of the Debtor, with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Credit Lending Services, Inc. (Terzian, Tamar) |
|
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Thu 04/25 1:37 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Status Hearing to be held on 06/13/2024 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1375 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (PP) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
misc
Supplemental
Wed 04/24 7:38 PM
Supplemental Debtor's Supplemental Reply to Use of Cash Collateral and Purchasing Contracts; Declaration of Chad L. Spindler, Declaration of Tamar Terzian, Declaration of Steve Coronado In Support Hereof, with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Credit Lending Services, Inc.. (Terzian, Tamar) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 5:48 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-01097. Complaint by Credit Lending Services, Inc. against The Park National Bank. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Terzian, Tamar) |
|
54 | 54
answer
Opposition
Tue 04/23 12:32 PM
Opposition to Filed by Creditor The Park National Bank (Argo, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Craig Larson |