Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 3:24-cv-05222
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Case in other court:Clark County Superior Court, 24-00002-00582-06
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 1:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Buckley Law PC
Defendant
William Gaar
Represented By
Amir Tadjedin
Tadjedin Thomas & Engbloom Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jaye Wickham Taylor
Plaintiff
Arthur McCallum
Represented By
Gregory W Albert
Albert Law PLLC
contact info
Tallman Harlow Trask, IV
Albert Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Wed 05/07 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Tallman Harlow Trask, IV for All Plaintiffs. (Trask, Tallman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
21 21 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Tue 05/06 11:43 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
20 20 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 08/09 4:49 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'7 Motion to Compel Arbitration. This matter is STAYED pending arbitration. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
19 19 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 07/16 1:44 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson - Dep Clerk: D. Staples ; Pla Counsel: Tallman Harlow Trask, IV ; Def Counsel: Amir Tadjedin ; CR: Nickie Drury ; Time of Hearing: 1:00 PM ; Courtroom: 16106 ; Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2024 re7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims filed by Buckley Law PC, Jaye Wickham Taylor, William Gaar. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes this matter under advisement. Order to be issued. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 07/11 4:10 PM
ORDER on Defendants'17 Unopposed Motion to Appear Remotely. Counsel for Defendants may appear remotely at the hearing scheduled for Tuesday, 7/16/2024, at 1:00 p.m. on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 07/11 12:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Order Allowing Counsel for Defendants to Appear by Phone or Video re 15 Notice of Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 7/11/2024, (Tadjedin, Amir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 06, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Thu 06/06 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING TIME. The Hearing time has been changed: Oral argument on7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims is set for 7/16/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 16106 before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 06/06 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims : Oral argument set for 7/16/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 16106 before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
14 14 respm Declaration Fri 04/19 2:57 PM
Supplemental DECLARATION of Jaye Wickham Taylor filed by All Defendants re7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims (Tadjedin, Amir)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/19 2:54 PM
REPLY, filed by All Defendants, TO RESPONSE to7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims (Tadjedin, Amir)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
12 12 respm Declaration Mon 04/15 4:49 PM
DECLARATION of Arthur McCallum filed by Plaintiff Arthur McCallum re7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims (Trask, Tallman)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/15 4:48 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Arthur McCallum, to7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims . (Trask, Tallman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
10 10 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/09 3:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the Parties, the initial deadlines set at Dkt. No.4 are struck. The Court will issue new deadlines as appropriate after it rules on Defendants' motion to compel arbitration (Dkt. No.7 ). Authorized by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
9 9 respm Declaration Thu 03/28 3:59 PM
DECLARATION of Jaye Wickham Taylor filed by All Defendants re7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims (Tadjedin, Amir)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Declaration Thu 03/28 3:58 PM
DECLARATION of Julie Engbloom filed by All Defendants re7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims (Tadjedin, Amir)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Compel Thu 03/28 3:56 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims , filed by All Defendants. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 4/19/2024, (Tadjedin, Amir)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 03/28 1:34 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Buckley Law PC. (Tadjedin, Amir)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
5 5 misc Verification of State Court Records Fri 03/22 3:01 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant William Gaar(Tadjedin, Amir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Information Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons - Buckley Law,
Att: 3 Summons - Gaar,
Att: 4 Summons - Taylor,
Att: 5 Case Assignment,
Att: 6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
4 4 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Fri 03/22 11:05 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/12/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/26/2024, Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2024. (DS)
Related: [-]
3 3 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Fri 03/22 10:57 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Fri 03/22 9:58 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/22 9:55 AM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 03/21 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 24 2-00582 06; Related [+] Attorney Amir Tadjedin added to party William Gaar(pty:dft) filed by William Gaar.(Tadjedin, Amir)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8399873
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint