Kneip v. California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00135 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 2:08 PM HST |
Defendant
California Casualty Idemnity Exchange
|
|
Plaintiff
Kristina Rose Kneip
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/27 2:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristina Rose Kneip. California Casualty Indemnity Exchange served on 3/25/2024. (Honda, Glenn) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/21 5:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kristina Rose Kneip. (Honda, Glenn) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/21 2:44 PM
Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Thu 03/21 2:43 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Thu 03/21 2:41 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/20/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/21/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/21 2:39 PM
Summons Issued as to California Casualty Indemnity Exchange. (eta) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/21 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00135 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons (Proposed)
Thu 03/21 1:50 PM
Summons (Proposed) (Honda, Glenn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2978081.), filed by Kristina Rose Kneip.(Honda, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |