American Holiday Van Lines, Inc.
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Suzanne H Bauknight |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-30459 |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Debtor
American Holiday Van Lines, Inc.
11424 Glen Iris Ln
Knoxville, TN 37934-1742 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
John P. Newton, Jr.
Mayer & Newton 8351 E. Walker Springs Lane Suite 100
Knoxville, TN 37923 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
800 Market Street, Suite 114 Howard H. Baker Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Knoxville, TN 37902 |
Docket last updated: 03/22/2024 12:02 AM EDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 03/21 8:53 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by William E. Maddox Jr. on behalf of American Holiday Van Lines, Inc.. (Maddox, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Thu 03/21 8:54 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by William E. Maddox Jr. on behalf of Debtor American Holiday Van Lines, Inc.. (Maddox, William) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN)
Thu 03/21 8:54 AM
Debtor Requests to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by William E. Maddox Jr. on behalf of Debtor American Holiday Van Lines, Inc.. (Maddox, William) |
|
4 | 4
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 03/21 9:45 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:3:24-bk-30459] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24017661. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Thu 03/21 9:46 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/23/2024 at 09:00 AM via Zoom meeting - John Newton: Meeting ID 405 777 7121, Passcode 9176068391, (865) 350-6897. (Maddox, William) |