Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:24-cv-01236
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Great American Finance Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan K. Aust
Bedard Law Group, P.C.
contact info
John H. Bedard, Jr.
Bedard Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Represented By
Paul L Myers
Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeanine Lynn Jones
Represented By
Octavio Gomez
The Consumer Lawyers PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, August 19, 2024
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/19 1:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Great American Finance Holdings, LLC by Jeanine Lynn Jones. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 08/19 2:56 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING26 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Great American Finance Holdings, LLC, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/15 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Jeanine Lynn Jones (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 08/15 3:51 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 07/25 11:14 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Trans Union LLC by Jeanine Lynn Jones. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 07/25 12:11 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING24 Stipulation of Dismissal of Trans Union LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (jkl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/24 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Jeanine Lynn Jones (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 07/24 12:26 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/11 2:16 PM
ORDER: The parties have reached a settlement of all ofPlaintiff's claims and plan to file the appropriate paperwork to dismiss the case. Based upon the parties' representations, theClerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The partiesshall file the appropriate dismissal documents within sixty (60) days of the date ofthis Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 6/11/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 06/11 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Great American Finance Holdings, LLC by Jeanine Lynn Jones (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/11 2:55 PM
Civil Case Administratively Terminated. Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III terminated from case. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Filing Thu 06/06 3:38 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Service of Initial Disclosures by Jeanine Lynn Jones (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/17 4:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:18 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 10/3/2024. Motions due by 11/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 5/17/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 05/16 3:14 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jeanine Lynn Jones. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 05/13 2:54 PM
Clerk's Notation re16 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 05/07 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union LLC by Jeanine Lynn Jones (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/06 8:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Finance Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Green Leaf Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate Tom Anderson, Other Affiliate Rich Crawley for Great American Finance Holdings, LLC. (Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/06 2:46 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Great American Finance Holdings, LLC. Discovery ends on 10/3/2024.(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 05/03 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services LLC by Jeanine Lynn Jones (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 05/01 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions Inc by Jeanine Lynn Jones (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/23 10:42 AM
ORDER by docket entry only granting12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Great American Finance Holdings, LLC's answer or other response to the complaint will be due no later than 5/6/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 4/23/24. (emm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 04/22 9:36 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Great American Finance Holdings, LLC.(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 04/22 11:45 AM
Clerk's Notation re11 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/16 1:52 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Goup, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/16 1:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Trans Union LLC.(Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/16 1:57 PM
ORDER by docket entry only granting10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Trans Union LLC's answer or other response to the complaint will be due no later than 5/10/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 4/16/24. (emm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 04/11 10:37 AM
Clerk's Notation re6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Thu 04/04 10:04 AM
Return of Service Executed by Jeanine Lynn Jones. Great American Finance Holdings, LLC served on 4/1/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Wed 04/03 12:10 PM
Return of Service Executed by Jeanine Lynn Jones. Trans Union LLC served on 3/29/2024, answer due 4/19/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/01 1:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeanine Lynn Jones. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver mailed on 3/29/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/29 1:01 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeanine Lynn Jones. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/21 4:07 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Great American Finance Holdings, LLC. (dnb)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/21 4:07 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. (dnb)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/21 4:06 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(dnb)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/21 4:05 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (dnb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/21 4:04 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jeanine Lynn Jones. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13306257)(dnb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet