Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 4:24-cv-00082
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By
Katherine Krouse Estroff
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl
contact info
Jana Laura Korhonen
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Penny Staten
Represented By
John Robert McCown
Warren & Griffin, P.C.
contact info
Randolph Scott Jackson, Jr.
R. Scott Jackson, Jr., Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 14, 2025
31 31 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 02/14 12:27 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff. (jpa)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Final Report and Recommendation Fri 02/14 12:20 PM
ORDER approving and adopting the28 Final Report and Recommendation. Defendant's19 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/14/25. (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 02/14 12:30 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 02/13 5:44 PM
Submission of28 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by Penny Staten, FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., to District Judge William M. Ray II. (sll)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
29 29 3 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 01/24 8:31 AM
ORDER for Service of28 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/24/25. (klb)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Fri 01/24 8:29 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by Penny Staten. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/24/25. (klb)
Related: [-]
motion Report and Recommendation - Final Fri 01/24 8:30 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment19 be GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/24/25. (klb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/08 8:26 AM
Submission of19 MOTION for Summary Judgment , to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Filing Tue 01/07 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Filing Corrected Deposition Transcript by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. re21 Notice of Filing(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Penny Staten Deposition Transcript
26 26 respm Reply Brief Tue 01/07 3:55 PM
REPLY BRIEF re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Support of filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Responses to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts,
Att: 2 Additional deposition excerpts of Penny Staten
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 12/17 8:23 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to file reply re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . The time for filing Defendant's Reply Brief is extended to and includes January 7, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/17/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/16 2:04 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re:19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/10 11:19 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Penny Staten.(Jackson, Randolph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit, Declaration of Penny Staten,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 3 Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 12/03 10:55 AM
ORAL ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to defendant's Motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's response to be filed on or before 12/10/24. Entered by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/3/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/02 3:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's19 Motion for Summary Judgment (7 days) by Penny Staten. (Jackson, Randolph) Modified on 12/2/2024 to add applicable link (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
utility Remark Tue 11/26 1:39 PM
Receipt of Manual Filing: 1 Flash Drive received in Rome Division re20 Notice of Filing. USB Scanned and placed in vault. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Filing Tue 11/12 1:04 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing Deposition and Exhibits by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of Penny Staten and Exhibits
20 20 notice Notice of Filing Tue 11/12 12:59 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing Electronic Media by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Tue 11/12 12:53 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 3 Appendix Appendix in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 4 Exhibit Staten deposition excerpts and relevant exhibits,
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Kalina Badsky,
Att: 6 Exhibit Declaration of Patricia Fleming,
Att: 7 Exhibit Declaration of Karen Greenlee,
Att: 8 Exhibit Declaration of Jonathan Lanham,
Att: 9 Exhibit Declaration of Scott Lee,
Att: 10 Exhibit Declaration of Kelli Schubert
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Tue 10/08 9:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE to Defendant Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.'s Amended Initial Disclosures by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
17 17 11 pgs order Order Tue 10/01 9:20 AM
CONSENT ORDER GOVERNING THE EXCHANGE AND PROTECTION OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/1/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
16 16 misc Proposed Consent Order Fri 09/27 2:24 PM
Proposed CONSENT ORDER Governing the Exchange and Protection on Confidential Information. (Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Fri 09/20 7:22 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant's Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Penny Staten by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
14 14 discov Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Penny Staten by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Penny Staten by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
12 12 discov Certificate of Service Thu 06/13 8:41 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Notice to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions Thu 06/13 8:14 AM
NOTICE to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 6/13/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/13 8:13 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. As an initial matter, the undersigned observes that mediation could be successful here, given the parties' indication that there is a possibility of settlement. The Court offers the services of its Magistrate Judges to mediate cases at no cost. Should the parties desire to mediate, they may contact the chambers of the Honorable Russell G. Vineyard (404-215-1375), Chief United States Magistrate Judge. Discovery ends on 10/10/2024. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 7/12/2024. Motions for summary judgment no later than 11/12/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2024, or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 6/13/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
9 9 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 06/12 3:36 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Penny Staten. (Jackson, Randolph)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/17 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jana Laura Korhonen on behalf of Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Korhonen, Jana)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/13 4:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/13 3:35 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/10/2024.(Estroff, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 04/12 8:10 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint . Defendant answer due 5/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 4/12/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/12 8:11 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. answer due 5/12/2024. (klb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/11 4:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Penny Staten.(Jackson, Randolph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Tue 03/26 2:44 PM
Return of Service Executed by Penny Staten. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. served on 3/22/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. (McCown, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/21 10:24 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (dob)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/21 10:22 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Penny Staten. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC13305647)(dob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet