Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Allison D Burroughs |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10737 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Wed 04/10 9:29 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff?s motion for a subpoena, [ECF No.8 ], is GRANTED . Plaintiff moved for leave to serve a third-party subpoena on Verizon Fios pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45. [ECF No.8 ]. Parties may be allowed to subpoena third parties before a Rule 26(f) conference where good cause exists, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1); Viken Detection Corp. v. Doe , No. 19-cv-12034, 2019 WL 5268725, at *1 (D. Mass. Oct. 17, 2019), and courts typically find that good cause supports allowing for early discovery in cases like this one, involving illegally downloaded media, where the movant is seeking to subpoena an internet service provider (?ISP?) in order to identify, by name and address, an unknown defendant behind an IP address, Breaking Glass Pictures v. Swarm Sharing Hash File SHA1: £973F491D02C1E0220DBC534D8F8EDC15FC53FAEF , No. 13-cv-10735, 2013 WL 2407226, at *4 (D. Mass. May 1, 2013); Viken , 2019 WL 5268725, at *1. The ?subpoena[] must be served alongside a special notice to the target of the subpoenaed information informing them of a 30-day period in which they may move to quash the subpoena,? Viken , 2019 WL 5268725, at *2, or raise any objections, as well as a copy of this Order and a copy of the Court?s Protective Order, [ECF No. 10 ]. Any filings shall only identify Defendant by his IP address or the John Doe pseudonym, pending further Court order. Finally, Plaintiff may only use the information disclosed in response to a Rule 45 subpoena served on the ISP for the purpose of protecting and enforcing Plaintiff?s rights as set forth in its Complaint. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
10 | 10
order
Protective Order
Wed 04/10 9:26 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 04/09 1:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re8 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Willianson, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Paige | ||
8 | 8
motion
Discovery
Tue 04/09 1:57 PM
MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
Fri 03/22 10:07 AM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet category sheet by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/22 9:14 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 03/22 8:21 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report on the filing/termination of copyright case
Thu 03/21 10:35 PM
REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case .(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/21 10:33 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 10:31 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10329533 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |