Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Levenson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10740 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Sealed Document
Wed 04/17 2:49 PM
Sealed- Verizon Online Proof of Service (unredacted - not for public) (Dumoulin, Rose) |
|
11 | 11
service
Notice of Service of Process
Wed 04/17 2:46 PM
Notice of Service of Process Individual(s)/Entities served: Verizon Online. (Dumoulin, Rose) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Wed 04/10 10:16 AM
Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: ORDER entered granting8 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Dumoulin, Rose) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 04/09 2:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re8 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Willianson, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Paige | ||
8 | 8
motion
Discovery
Tue 04/09 2:06 PM
MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
Fri 03/22 10:12 AM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet category sheet by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 10:02 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/22 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 03/22 8:25 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report on the filing/termination of copyright case
Thu 03/21 11:06 PM
REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case .(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/21 11:04 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/21 11:01 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10329546 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |