Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Walter H Rice
Referred: Caroline H Gentry
Case #: 3:24-cv-00090
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Dayton-Phoenix Group, Inc.
Represented By
Rudi S. Alysia Julius
Thompson Hine, Llp., Two Alliance Center
contact info
Deborah S Brenneman
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerie Peters
Represented By
Daniel I'Anson Bryant
Bryant Legal, LLC
contact info
Joseph Francis Scott
Scott & Winters Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Esther Elizabeth Bryant
Bryant Legal, LLC
contact info
Kevin M. McDermott, II
Scott & Winters Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Ryan A. Winters
Scott And Winters Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
misc Notice of Corrective Docket Entry Mon 03/31 9:35 AM
Notice of Correction re: 11 Order, DELETE, DOCUMENT FILED IN THE INCORRECT CASE; CLERICAL ERROR, COUNSEL NOTIFIED (pb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 03/28 4:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Walter H. Rice: Preliminary Pretrial TeleConference held on 3/27/2025. Counsel for the Plaintiff, Daniel Bryant and Ryan Winters, Counsel for the Defendant, Jessica MacKeigan appearing. (Jury Trial set for 10/26/2026 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H. Rice., Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2026 at 5:00 p.m. by Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice.) Scheduling order to issue. (Court Reporter: Caryl Blevins) (bjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 03/24 3:48 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Related [+] by Defendant Dayton-Phoenix Group, Inc.. (Brenneman, Deborah)
Related: [-] vised
Thursday, February 20, 2025
notice Notice setting Hearings and Deadlines Sun 02/23 8:51 PM
NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 4:00 p.m. by Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/24/2025. Counsel shall call 1-646-828-7666 to participate in the telephone conference with Judge Walter H. Rice. The Meeting ID is 160 557 2665 and the Meeting Passcode is 842953. (bjr)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 03/26 10:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Walter H. Rice: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/20/2025.Counsel for Plaintiff, Daniel Bryant, Counsel for Defendant Deborah Brenneman and Jessica MacKeigan, appearing. Statement by Court. Dialogue between the parties. Some information has been exchanged between the parties. The parties agree that a revised 26F report is appropriate. Revised 26f to be filed by the close of business 3/24/2025. Further scheduling conference set for 3/27/2025 at 4:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: Caryl Blevins) (bjr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/24 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn MacKeigan for Defendant Dayton-Phoenix Group, Inc. (MacKeigan, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
order Order Mon 08/12 4:40 PM
NOTATION ORDER striking8 Notice of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures - Absent circumstances not present here, parties must not file notices of initial disclosures with the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(A). Accordingly,8 Defendant's Notice of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures is STRICKEN from the record. The Clerk is DIRECTED to restrict that filing to court access only. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 08/12/2024. (lcp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/09 12:49 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Dayton-Phoenix Group, Inc. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Brenneman, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/27 4:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held: Telephone Conference held on 6/27/2024. (Jury Trial set for 6/22/2026 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H. Rice. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2026 05:00 PM in Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice.). Scheduling Order to issue. (tp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 06/21 3:03 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Valerie Peters. (Bryant, Esther)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/24 2:44 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Dayton-Phoenix Group, Inc.. (Brenneman, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/25 2:10 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rudi S. Alysia Julius Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 4/25/2024. (srb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
5 5 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/23 10:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9932903) of Rudi S. Alysia Julius by Defendant Dayton-Phoenix Group, Inc.. (Brenneman, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/17 11:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dayton-Phoenix Group, Inc. on 3/27/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/28 5:53 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Valerie Peters Consent to Join (Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/26 10:11 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Valerie Peters Consent to Join (Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join
Thursday, March 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/21 6:15 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Dayton-Phoenix Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9879504), filed by Valerie Peters. (Bryant, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to be Named Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet