SMART NOT DUMB ENTERTAINMENT DBA WARRIOR WRESTLING
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | David D Cleary |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-04138 |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Debtor
SMART NOT DUMB ENTERTAINMENT DBA WARRIOR WRESTLING
4422 N. Maiden Street #2
Chicago, IL 60640 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Gus A Paloian
Seyfarth, Shaw, Et Al 233 S. Wacker Drive Suite 8000
Chicago, IL 60606 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 03/22/2024 12:03 AM CDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Thu 03/21 5:11 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by Eric G Zelazny on behalf of SMART NOT DUMB ENTERTAINMENT DBA WARRIOR WRESTLING (Zelazny, Eric) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 03/21 5:13 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-04138 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47675396. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Zelazny, Eric) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Attachment (Do Not Use for Proposed Order)
Thu 03/21 5:14 PM
Attachment(s) Signature Pages Filed by Eric G Zelazny on behalf of SMART NOT DUMB ENTERTAINMENT DBA WARRIOR WRESTLING . (Zelazny, Eric) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation)
Thu 03/21 6:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/18/2024 at 12:30 PM via Zoom - Paloian: Meeting ID 606 284 9180, Passcode 0161213137, Phone 1-872-201-2698. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |