Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joshua P Searcy
Case #: 6:24-bk-60174
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024

Debtor
Wing Dinger Lindale LLC
PO Box 798
Mineola, TX 75773-0798
Represented By
Robert F. Kemp
Law Office Of Robert F. Kemp
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 03/22/2024 12:03 AM CDT
Thursday, March 21, 2024
crditcrd none Thu 03/21 1:13 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-60174 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number B13266167, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 03/21 9:55 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Without Schedules, Statements, and All Other Required Documents. Filed by Wing Dinger Lindale LLC, Document Due 03/28/2024.(Kemp, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Thu 03/21 2:35 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by Wing Dinger Lindale LLC Related [+]. (Kemp, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Without Schedules, Statements, and All Other Required Documents. Filed by Wing Dinger Lindale LLC, Document Due 03/28/2024. filed by Debtor Wing Dinger Lindale LLC