Florida Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00021
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 3:24 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTOINE V BOOKER, JR (1)
Represented By
JOHN ANTHONY GEORGE TERREZZA
Terrezza Law - Pensacola Fl
contact info
JOSEPH FRANS DEBELDER
Federal Public Defender Office - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JESSICA S ETHERTON
Doj-Usao
contact info
DAVID L GOLDBERG
Us Attorney - Pensacola Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:21 AM EDT
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. (1). (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Criminal Complaint (Sealed per Privacy Policy) by USA as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR.. (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. for 2/26/2024. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/21/2024. (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
5 5 NOTICE OF HEARING as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. Initial Appearance set for 2/26/2024 11:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON, Courtroom 3N, United States Courthouse, One North Palafox Street, Pensacola, Florida 32502. NOTE: If you or any party, witness, or attorney in this matter have a disability which requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment requiring a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction requiring ramp access, please contact Office of the Clerk at 850-435-8440 at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements may be made. s/ K. Igney Courtroom Deputy Clerk [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON:Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. held on 2/26/2024. (Court Reporter DCR) (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. (PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. JOSEPH FRANS DEBELDER for ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. appointed. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/26/2024. (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORAL MOTION FOR DETENTION by USA as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION - HEARING WAIVED and granting the Government's 9 Oral Motion FOR DETENTION as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. (1). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/26/2024. (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
11 11 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 2/26/2024 in case as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
Attorney update in case as to ANTOINE V BOOKER, JR. Attorney JOSEPH FRANS DEBELDER terminated. (blr)
Related: [-]
12 12 CJA Appointment as to ANTOINE BOOKER, JR.: Appointment of Attorney JOHN ANTHONY GEORGE TERREZZA for ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. The appointment will be created and appear in the eVoucher system. You can access the eVoucher system and materials on the NDFL web site located at www.flnd.uscourts.gov under attorney resources. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/5/2024. (kli) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JOHN ANTHONY GEORGE TERREZZA appearing for ANTOINE BOOKER, JR. (TERREZZA, JOHN ANTHONY) [3:24-mj-00049-HTC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
14 14 INDICTMENT (PDF redacted per privacy policy.) as to ANTOINE V BOOKER, JR (1) Counts 1, 2, 3. (blr)
Related: [-]
15 15 Sealed Document - (Unredacted Indictment) (blr)
Related: [-]
16 16 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to ANTOINE V BOOKER, JR (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (blr)
Related: [-]