New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00159
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 3:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Tenzin Norbu (1)
Represented By
John Thomas Zach
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Benjamin M. Burkett
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 5:19 PM EDT
Monday, April 09, 2018
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Tenzin Norbu (1). Violations of 18 U.S.C. §§ 371, 1546 (a), and 2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger) (jbo) (jbo). [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
3 3 3 pgs Limited Unsealing Order as to Tenzin Norbu. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 5/1/18)(jbo) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
Arrest of Tenzin Norbu. (jbo) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
Attorney update in case as to Tenzin Norbu. Attorney John Thomas Zach for Tenzin Norbu added. (jbo) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Tenzin Norbu. John Zach appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron) (jbo) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Initial Appearance as to Tenzin Norbu held on 12/20/2023. Detention Hearing as to Tenzin Norbu held on 12/20/2023. Defendant present with CJA counsel John Zach. AUSA Benjamin Burkett present for the Government. BAIL DISPOSITION: Detention on consent without prejudice. ***Preliminary Hearing Date: 1/19/24. On defendant's consent. (jbo) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
6 6 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Tenzin Norbu. Time excluded from 1/18/24 until 2/20/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/18/24)(vb) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
7 7 AFFIRMATION of Benjamin M. Burkett in Support by USA as to Tenzin Norbu re:6 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (vb) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
8 8 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Tenzin Norbu. Time excluded from 2/20/24 until 3/21/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 2/20/24)(jbo) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIRMATION of AUSA Benjamin M. Burkett in Support by USA as to Tenzin Norbu re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jbo) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis:Detention Hearing as to Tenzin Norbu held on 3/1/2024, As to Tenzin Norbu. Defendant present with counsel Mr.Zach; AUSA Getzel Berger is also present. No disposition.( Detention Hearing set for 3/5/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 228, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Unassigned.) (jm) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis: Detention Hearing as to Tenzin Norbu held on 3/5/2024. AUSA Getzel Berger present for the Government. Defendant present with CJA attorney, John Zach. BAIL DISPOSITION: $50,000 personal recognizance bond; To be co-signed by three financially responsible persons; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by pretrial services; Stand alone monitoring; GPS; He is to have stand alone GPS monitoring and may not leave SDNY and EDNY and may not go within a prescribed distance of an airport; Mr. Norbu is to have three co-signers on his bond. The Court's preference is that they be Yeshi Tawa, Samten Choephet and Professor William Edelglass. If any of these three potential co-signers is found by the government to not qualify, then other potential co-signers may be considered; Mr. Norbu may be released on his own signature and that of two co-signers; Remaining conditions to be met by: 3/12/24. (job) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
12 12 APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Tenzin Norbu. $50,000 personal recognizance bond; To be co-signed by three financially responsible persons. Additional conditions... (job) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/12/2024) (job). [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to Tenzin Norbu. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court set the conditions of bail contained in the attached disposition sheet. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 3/5/2024)(job) [1:18-mj-02959-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
Case Designated ECF as to Tenzin Norbu. (jm)
Related: [-]
14 14 INDICTMENT FILED as to Tenzin Norbu (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jm)
Related: [-]