District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00141
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1)
Represented By
Kevin A. Tate
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
WHITNEY ELIZABETH JOHNSON (2)
Represented By
Peter A. Cooper
Peter A. Cooper
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mindy L Deranek
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2024 8:26 PM EDT
Friday, February 16, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1), WHITNEY JOHNSON (2). (zljn) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redacted Statement of Facts
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON, WHITNEY JOHNSON.(zljn) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1), WHITNEY JOHNSON (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 02/16/2024. (zljn) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
Arrest of ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON in Florida. (zljn) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON, WHITNEY JOHNSON (zljn) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Arrest of WHITNEY JOHNSON in Florida. (zljn) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant, dated 02/16/2024, Returned Executed on 2/22/2024 as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON. (zljn) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant, dated 02/16/2024, Returned Executed on 2/22/2024 as to WHITNEY JOHNSON. (zljn) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
MINUTE ORDER as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1) & WHITNEY JOHNSON (2): It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants appear for an initial appearance on 3/5/2024 at 12:30 p.m. EST before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference; call-in instructions will be provided to counsel prior to the hearing. Counsel for the United States is directed to ensure that counsel for Defendant has received this Order and will provide the information to Defendant. If Defendant does not have counsel, counsel for the United States is directed to contact the Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Columbia and provide their office with the information contained in this Order. If the parties have questions about this Order or the scheduled hearing, please contact the Courtroom Deputy at 202-354-3083. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 2/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 2/27/2024. (znjb) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
MINUTE ORDER as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1), WHITNEY JOHNSON (2) : As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 3/5/2024. (ztl) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1). (ztl) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1). (ztl) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather: First Appearance in the District as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1) held on 3/5/2024. The Court Advised the Government of its Due Process Obligations Under Rule 5(f). Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1); heard and granted. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1); heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded from 3/5/2024 to 3/12/2024 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Ascertainment of Counsel set for 3/12/2024 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remain on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: FTR-GOLD; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 7: [1:28:16-1:39:30]; Defense Attorney: Kate Adams; US Attorney: Fred Yette for Mindy Deranek; Pretrial Officer: Britney Dahlkoetter. (ztl) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by WHITNEY JOHNSON (2). (ztl) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to WHITNEY JOHNSON (2). (ztl) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather: First Appearance in the District as to WHITNEY JOHNSON (2) held on 3/5/2024. The Court Advised the Government of its Due Process Obligations Under Rule 5(f). Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel as to WHITNEY JOHNSON (2); heard and granted. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to WHITNEY JOHNSON (2); heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded from 3/5/2024 to 3/12/2024 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Ascertainment of Counsel set for 3/12/2024 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remain on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: FTR-GOLD; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 7: [1:28:16-1:39:30]; Defense Attorney: Kate Adams; US Attorney: Fred Yette for Mindy Deranek; Pretrial Officer: Britney Dahlkoetter. (ztl) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1) Personal Recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 3/5/2023. (Attachment: #1 Appearance Bond) (ztl) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to WHITNEY JOHNSON (2) Personal Recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 3/5/2024. (Attachment: #1 Appearance Bond) (znjb) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter A. Cooper appearing for WHITNEY JOHNSON (Cooper, Peter) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin A. Tate appearing for ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (Tate, Kevin) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1). (znjb) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1). (znjb) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya: Ascertainment of Counsel Hearing as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1) held on 3/12/2024. Defendant present by video. Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1); heard and granted. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1); heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded between 3/12/2024 to 4/2/2024 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Defendant waives right to Preliminary Hearing within 21 days of Initial Appearance. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/2/2024 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant remains on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 5: [1:35:58-1:46:49]; Defense Attorney: Kevin Tate; US Attorney: Frederick Yette for Mindy Deranek; Pretrial Officer: Shania Fennell. (znjb) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by WHITNEY JOHNSON (2). (znjb) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to WHITNEY JOHNSON (2). (znjb) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya: Ascertainment of Counsel Hearing as to WHITNEY JOHNSON (2) held on 3/12/2024. Defendant present by video. Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel as to WHITNEY JOHNSON (2); heard and granted. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to WHITNEY JOHNSON (2); heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded between 3/12/2024 to 5/14/2024 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Defendant waives right to timely Preliminary Hearing. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/14/2024 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant remains on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 5: [1:35:58-1:46:49]; Defense Attorney: Peter Cooper; US Attorney: Frederick Yette for Mindy Deranek; Pretrial Officer: Shania Fennell. (znjb) [1:24-mj-00062-ZMF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
MINUTE ORDER: The hearing currently scheduled for 4/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey is hereby VACATED, as ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1): has had an initial appearance in this jurisdiction and has been charged by Indictment. As such, there are no pending matters necessitating action by a magistrate judge. The parties are directed to contact the assigned District Judge to schedule a status hearing and arraignment, if one has not yet been set. The parties are instructed to address any requests to toll the Speedy Trial Act to the assigned District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/20/2024. (znjb)
Related: [-]
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1): Preliminary Hearing set for 4/2/2024 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey is hereby VACATED. (znjb)
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER: The hearing currently scheduled for 5/14/2024 before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya is hereby VACATED, as WHITNEY JOHNSON (2): has had an initial appearance in this jurisdiction and has been charged by Indictment. As such, there are no pending matters necessitating action by a magistrate judge. The parties are directed to contact the assigned District Judge to schedule a status hearing and arraignment, if one has not yet been set. The parties are instructed to address any requests to toll the Speedy Trial Act to the assigned District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/20/2024. (znjb)
Related: [-]
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to WHITNEY ELIZABETH JOHNSON (2): Preliminary Hearing set for 5/14/2024 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya is hereby VACATED. (znjb)
Related: [-]
Counts added: WHITNEY ELIZABETH JOHNSON (2) count(s) 4 (zltp)
Related: [-]
14 14 5 pgs INDICTMENT as to ANDREW JOSHUA JOHNSON (1) count(s) 1, 4, 5, 7, 8, 10, WHITNEY JOHNSON (2) count(s) 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 8, 9, 10. (zhsj) Modified count on 4/4/2024 (zltp).
Related: [-]