Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:24-cv-00555
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 1:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Becca's Restaurant & Sports Lounge
Plaintiff
Sydney Ellerbe
304 S Jones Blvd Suite 2128
Las Vegas, NV 89107


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation ~Util - Terminate Case Thu 11/14 3:50 PM
ORDER adopting8 Report and Recommendation in full. This action is DISMISSED, and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/14/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
8 8 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 10/29 10:09 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to send this recommendation to Plaintiff. (Mailed 10/29/2024). Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/29/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Show Cause Tue 09/10 11:49 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff must file a response to this order on or before October 10, 2024 explaining why the Court should not recommend dismissal of this action. The Clerk's Office is kindly directed to send a copy of this order and of the screening order (ECF No.5 ) to Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation of dismissal to the district judge. Show Cause Response due by 10/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/10/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of
Att: 5 Screening Order
Friday, July 26, 2024
6 6 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Becca's Restaurant & Sports Lounge by Sydney Ellerbe. (CAH)
Related: [-]
5 5 11 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 07/26 3:16 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall not be required to pre-pay the filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to file Plaintiffs complaint ECF Nos.1 -1,1 -2,1 -3 on the docket but shall not issue summons. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint ECF Nos.1 -1,1 -2,1 -3) is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, with leave to amend. Plaintiff will have until August 26, 2024, to file an amended complaint if the noted deficiencies can be corrected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/26/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
4 4 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/16 9:36 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sydney Ellerbe. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/27 12:35 PM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before April 25, 2024, Plaintiff will either pay the full $405 filing fee for a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $55 administrative fee) or file with the Court a completed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on this Courts approved form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff does not file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full $405 filing fee for a civil action on or before April 25, 2024, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/26/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF cc IFP Form, Instructions mailed to Plaintiff - CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Fri 03/22 10:12 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Fri 03/22 8:55 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Photo Index,
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ALZ)
Related: [-]