Sturkey v. State of Florida et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn Kimball Mizelle |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00709 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Transmittal of initial appeal package
Mon 04/08 2:44 PM
TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re5 Notice of Appeal. (AA) (AA) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 04/08 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to2 Order3 Judgment by Willie Joe Sturkey. Filing fee not paid.(AA) |
|
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Inquiry
Fri 04/05 10:20 AM
NOTICE of inquiry by Willie Joe Sturkey. Clerk responded with courtesy copy of docket sheet, blank IFP form and 2 blank copies of the summons form as requested.(AM) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Judgment
Wed 03/27 2:01 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants ( Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JTM) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
8
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/25 2:26 PM
ORDER: Sturkey's 1 complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The CLERK is directed to enter judgment in Defendants' favor and to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/25/2024. (MLH) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Hillsborough County Jail, Juliann M. Holt(Public Defender - Individual Capacity), Juliann M. Holt(Public Defender - Official Capacity), Susan Lopez(State Attorney - Individual Capacity), Susan Lopez(State Attorney - Official Capacity), State of Florida, Cindy Stuart(Clerk of Court - Official Capacity), Cindy Stuart(Clerk of Court - Individual Capacity) filed by Willie Joe Sturkey. Fee not paid. No IFP Motion filed. (AM) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope |