Hudgins-Verellen v. St. Petersburg PD
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn Kimball Mizelle |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00711 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 3:34 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen.(JDR) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 11:25 AM
ORDER denying 5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis without prejudice to Hudgins-Verellen's paying the filing fee or submitting a Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate by April 19, 2024. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/10/2024. (MLH) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 11:09 AM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen.(AA) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/03 11:30 AM
NOTICE to the Court by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen(AM) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/29 8:51 AM
ORDER: Hudgins-Verellen's 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. Hudgins-Verellen must either pay the $405.00 filing fee or file a fully completed Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate no later than April 19, 2024. The CLERK is directed to SEND Hudgins-Verellen a copy of this order, including attachments. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/29/2024. (MLH) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/22 2:13 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen. (AM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 2:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Christopher Bishop(Arresting Officer - Official Capacity), Christopher Bishop(Arresting Officer - Individual Capacity), Jace Morrow(Arresting Officer - Official Capacity), Jace Morrow(Arresting Officer - Individual Capacity), St. Petersburg PD filed by Sylvia Hope Hudgins-Verellen.(AM) |
|
Att: 1 Letter to Clerk, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope |