Los Agaves Grill, Inc. v. Los Agaves, LLC
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret R Guzman |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-40049 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 7:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Los Agaves, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Los Agaves Grill, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/16 10:10 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Los Agaves, LLC answer due 5/16/2024. (Castles, Martin) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/15 11:00 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 16, 2024 to File Answer by Los Agaves, LLC.(Harding, Connor) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Connor Walsh Harding on behalf of Los Agaves, LLC (Harding, Connor) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Walker on behalf of Los Agaves, LLC (Walker, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/01 1:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Los Agaves Grill, Inc. served on 3/26/2024, answer due 4/16/2024. (Kosakowski, Richard) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 1:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Los Agaves, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barrows, Jennifer) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/22 1:10 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Barrows, Jennifer) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 12:47 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Los Agaves Grill, Inc.. (Kosakowski, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Exhibit
Fri 03/22 12:45 PM
EXHIBIT re1 Complaint, Exhibit 3 by Los Agaves Grill, Inc.. (Kosakowski, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Exhibit
Fri 03/22 12:43 PM
EXHIBIT re1 Complaint, Exhibit 2 by Los Agaves Grill, Inc.. (Kosakowski, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit
Fri 03/22 12:41 PM
EXHIBIT re1 Complaint, Exhibit 1 by Los Agaves Grill, Inc.. (Kosakowski, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Los Agaves, LLC Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10330229 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Los Agaves Grill, Inc..(Kosakowski, Richard)#1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barrows, Jennifer). Modified on 3/22/2024 (Barrows, Jennifer) |