Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-52488

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:24-ap-02016
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ohio Attorney General
Rhodes State Office Tower, 30 East Broad Street 14th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services
P O Box 182212
Columbus, OH 43218
Represented By
Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Nealey
5689 Briardale Ct Apt B
Dublin, OH 43016
Represented By
Shannon Nealey
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, September 27, 2024
14 14 misc Brief Fri 09/27 3:45 PM
Brief Trial Filed by Defendants Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services Related [+]. (Radwanick, Kristin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, September 20, 2024
13 13 misc Exhibit List Fri 09/20 12:46 PM
Exhibit List Filed by Defendants Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services. (Radwanick, Kristin)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Witness List Fri 09/20 12:45 PM
Witness List Filed by Defendants Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services. (Radwanick, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 23, 2024
11 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Mon 06/24 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 06/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)10 Scheduling Order
Friday, June 21, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/21 3:04 PM
Pretrial Scheduling Order Following Pretrial Conference. Trial date set for 10/4/2024 at 09:30 AM Columbus Courtroom A for1 , Discovery Due: 8/30/2024. Related [+]. (kab)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Shannon Nealey
Thursday, June 06, 2024
court Hearing Continued (Other) Thu 06/20 9:11 AM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 06/05 9:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Cory David Steinmetz Filed by Defendant Ohio Attorney General. (Steinmetz, Cory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
8 8 misc Pretrial Statement Wed 05/29 4:35 PM
Pretrial Statement Filed by Plaintiff Shannon Nealey Related [+]. (spd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
7 7 misc Pretrial Statement Wed 05/29 3:48 PM
Pretrial Statement Filed by Defendants Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services Related [+]. (Radwanick, Kristin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, May 26, 2024
6 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Mon 05/27 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)5 Scheduling Order
Friday, May 24, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/24 3:40 PM
Amended General Pretrial Order and Notice of Pretrial Conference. Scheduling Order Pretrial set for 6/5/2024 at 02:00 PM Columbus Conference Room 4th Floor for1 , Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/29/2024. Related [+]. (dap)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Shannon Nealey
Sunday, April 28, 2024
4 4 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Mon 04/29 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)3 Scheduling Order
Friday, April 26, 2024
3 3 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/26 3:05 PM
General Pretrial Oder and Notice of Pretrial Conference. Pretrial set for 6/5/2024 at 10:00 AM Columbus Conference Room 4th Floor for1 . Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/29/2024. Related [+]. (ao)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Shannon Nealey
Sunday, April 21, 2024
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Sun 04/21 9:38 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services. (Radwanick, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/21 1:55 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-02016. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Shannon Nealey against Ohio Attorney General, Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services . Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount of $ 0.00 is Exempt (ao)
Related: [-]