DHaiti v. Leonard
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Corrigan |
Referred: | Philip R Lammens |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00145 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order to complete service forms
Wed 04/17 3:33 PM
ORDER to complete service forms. Plaintiff is directed to return forms and one identical copy of 10 Second Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/17/2024. (KLS) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 3:24 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and denying as moot 9 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $0. Plaintiff is assessed the total $350 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/17/2024. (KLS) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Prisoner consent form and financial certificate
Tue 04/16 12:49 PM
PRISONER consent form and financial certificate by Pierre Ronald DHaiti.(HAI) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/16 12:48 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Leonard with Jury Demand. filed by Pierre Ronald DHaiti. Related document: 8 Amended Complaint filed by Pierre Ronald DHaiti.(HAI) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 11:12 AM
Second MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Pierre Ronald DHaiti attachment(s) : #1 Mailing Envelope) (HAI). (HAI) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Additional |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/12 11:07 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Leonard filed by Pierre Ronald DHaiti. (No service copies provided) Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Pierre Ronald DHaiti.(HAI) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Mon 04/08 4:19 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/8/2024. (KLS) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 04/05 2:49 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Pierre Ronald DHaiti.(HAI) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/26 3:58 PM
ORDER ruling deferred 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to file a completed prisoner consent form within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank prisoner consent form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/26/2024. (KLS) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order to file amended complaint
Tue 03/26 3:54 PM
ORDER to file amended complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form marked "Amended Complaint." Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/26/2024. (KLS) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants
Fri 03/22 11:53 AM
STANDING ORDER for all confined pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/22/2024. (RLK) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/22 11:49 AM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Pierre Ronald DHaiti. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 11:48 AM
COMPLAINT against FNU Leonard with Jury Demand filed by Pierre Ronald DHaiti. (no service copies provided)(RLK) Modified on 3/22/2024 to edit docket text (AJS) |