Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:24-cv-00558
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Terminated:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Insurance XL Inc.
Represented By
Monique Nicole Reyes
Monique N. Reyes. P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sommer Sherwood
a Florida resident 14855 Hawksmoor Run Circle
Orlando, FL 32828


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 01, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/01 12:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Insurance XL Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Monday, May 13, 2024
15 15 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 05/13 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELM)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/13 11:07 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice re 12 Joint Notice of Resolution. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/13/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing - Cancel Fri 05/10 9:57 AM
NOTICE canceling Case Management Conference scheduled for 5/15/24 at 9:30 AM. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of settlement Tue 05/07 3:35 PM
NOTICE of settlement and Motion to Stay Deadlines by Insurance XL Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Tue 04/30 4:52 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing re 4 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program: Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2024 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5D before Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. See PDF Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/30/2024. (SFC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/23 10:43 AM
ORDER granting 9 Unilateral Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including May 7, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/23/2024. (SFC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 04/17 3:51 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Insurance XL Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of appearance Tue 04/16 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Monique Nicole Reyes on behalf of Insurance XL Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Monique
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
7 7 service Summons returned executed Tue 04/09 3:39 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/27/2024 by Sommer Sherwood as to Insurance XL Inc. (e-portal) (ARL)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/09 3:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sommer Sherwood. (e-portal)(ARL)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 04/09 3:36 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sommer Sherwood. Related case(s): No (e-portal) (ARL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Mon 03/25 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Mon 03/25 11:34 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/25/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
2 2 service Summons issued Fri 03/22 12:18 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Insurance XL Inc. (AJS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/22 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Insurance XL Inc. with Jury Demand. Filing fee $405, receipt number ORL 111133 filed by Sommer Sherwood.(AJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons