Petit v. Clear Blue Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Anne C Conway |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00564 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 12:0635 Breach of Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE EIGHTEENTH JUDICIAL CI, 05-02024-CA-016509-XX |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Clear Blue Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ketty Petit
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Case Management Report
Fri 04/19 3:38 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Glasgow, Gina) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Response to order to show cause
Fri 04/05 7:36 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re7 Order to show cause filed by Clear Blue Insurance Company.(Glasgow, Gina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/28 6:53 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Clear Blue Insurance Company.(Glasgow, Gina) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 03/26 1:58 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/26/2024. (KLD) |
|
7 | 7
6
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Tue 03/26 11:13 AM
ORDER to Show Cause as to Clear Blue Insurance Company. Defendant Clear Blue Insurance Company is ORDERED to show cause within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why this case should not be remanded for failure to adequately plead the requisite amount in controversy to support federal subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/25/2024. (KLD) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 03/25 12:04 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Yitzhak Levin of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 03/25 7:17 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gina Sciortino Glasgow on behalf of Clear Blue Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Gina S. Glasgow. (Glasgow, Gina) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/25 7:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Clear Blue Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Clear Blue Financial Holdings, LLC for Clear Blue Insurance Company. (Glasgow, Gina) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 03/25 7:14 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Clear Blue Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Glasgow, Gina) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/22 2:22 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-564-ACC-LRH. (TNP) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/22 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 05-2024-CA-016509-XXCA-BC filed in State Court on 2/16/24. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21900729 filed by Clear Blue Insurance Company.(Glasgow, Gina) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Property Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Voter Records, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit C - Corporate Documents, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Estimate, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Pleadings |