MANLEY v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Anthony E Porcelli |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00725 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court,6th Jud. Circuit, Pinellas County, 24-000001-CI |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
YEMER YVONNE MANLEY
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/19 3:16 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Anthony M. Georges-Pierre, Jorge Costa, Santiago Lavandera of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim
Fri 04/19 2:16 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the amended complaint (Doc. 12 ), "Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law" (Doc. 8 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/19/2024. (ANL) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 11:54 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Yemer Yvonne Manley. (Georges-Pierre, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/18 5:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Yemer Yvonne Manley.(Georges-Pierre, Anthony) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 04/18 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Georges-Pierre on behalf of Yemer Yvonne Manley (Georges-Pierre, Anthony) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/08 10:09 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/08 10:09 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 03/28 6:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Sparks, Derek) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/28 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Sparks, Derek) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 03/26 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lorena Blanco on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Blanco, Jennifer) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 03/26 12:08 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sparks, Derek) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 03/26 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Derek H. Sparks on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Derek H. Sparks. (Sparks, Derek) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 03/25 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/22 4:52 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-725-TPB-AEP. (AA) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/22 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 24-000001-CI filed in State Court on December 29, 2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21900886 filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc..(Sparks, Derek) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Joe Dickerson, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Composite C - State Court Docket Sheet and Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |