Cooper v. Mayorkas et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret R Guzman |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-10745 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Attorney General of the United States, in his official capacity United States Attorney General 950 Pennsylvania Ave
Washington, DC 20530 |
|
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
Camp Springs, MD 20588
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Washington, DC, DC 20529
|
|
Defendant
Kirt Thompson
|
|
Plaintiff
Princess Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/12 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. O'Connor on behalf of Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson (O'Connor, Nicole) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 04/05 3:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Princess Cooper. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Princess Cooper. (Cameron Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
General Order 19-02
Fri 03/22 1:48 PM
General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice for Social Security and Immigration Cases
Fri 03/22 1:48 PM
Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 1:48 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/22 1:27 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
transfer
Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer
Fri 03/22 1:24 PM
Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 3/22/2024 Case Number 1:24-cv-10745. (Alba, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
transfer
Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer
Fri 03/22 1:14 PM
Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10330470 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Princess Cooper.(Cameron Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Category Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |