Endobotics, LLC v. Hologic, Inc.
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Patti B Saris |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10746 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Hologic, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Endobotics, LLC
Law Offices of Scott H. Bernstein LLC 101 Eisenhower Parkway Suite #300
Roseland, NJ 07068 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/09 1:39 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Hologic, Inc. answer due 5/20/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/05 5:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2024 to File Answer re1 Complaint, (UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT) by Hologic, Inc..(Barlow, Joshua) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/05 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Barlow on behalf of Hologic, Inc. (Barlow, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/02 8:44 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endobotics, LLC. |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/29 5:21 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Endobotics, LLC. Hologic, Inc. served on 3/29/2024, answer due 4/19/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Endobotics, LLC. |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Tue 03/26 5:41 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ariel Reinitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 3:36 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/22 3:12 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Report on the filing of patent/trademark case
Fri 03/22 2:47 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Bernstein, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/22 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Bernstein on behalf of Endobotics, LLC (Bernstein, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 03/22 2:27 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms/Local Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing of patent/trademark case. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/22 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ariel Reinitz Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10330761 by Endobotics, LLC.(Bernstein, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Ariel Reinitz) | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Hologic, Inc. Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10330697 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Endobotics, LLC.(Bernstein, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Category Form, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons |