DeGross et al v. Hunter et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | David G Estudillo |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-05225 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 3:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Natalie Green
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ross Hunter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ruben Reeves
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeanine Tacchini
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer DeGross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shane DeGross
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() ORDER granting the Parties'33 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Stay. All proceedings in this matter are stayed and the parties are instructed to update the Court no later than 7/7/2025 on the status of a potential settlement. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(CJS) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF STAY , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 4/3/2025, (Pavela, Marko) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() ORDER. All proceedings in this matter will remain stayed and the parties are instructed to update the Court no later than April 7, 2025 on the status of a potential settlement. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (MW) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Stay by parties |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MINUTE ORDER. The reassignment of pending motions in this case to Judge Robert J. Bryan is terminated. Authorized by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (CJS) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() ORDER re Parties'28 Stipulated MOTION to Stay . All proceedings in this matter are stayed and the parties are instructed to update the Court no later than January 7, 2025 on the status of a potential settlement. All case deadlines from the Scheduling Order, Dkt. #27 , are stricken. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(MW) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Stipulated MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendants Natalie Green, Ross Hunter, Ruben Reeves, Jeanine Tacchini. Noting Date 9/16/2024, (Ebel, Madeline) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER granting Defendants'26 Motion for Extension of Initial Case Deadlines. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/2/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/9/2024, Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2024, Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 09:00 AM via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(MW) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 8/2/2024, (Pavela, Marko) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER denying without prejudice13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() REPLY, filed by All Defendants, TO RESPONSE to13 MOTION to Dismiss (Pavela, Marko) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings
Wed 06/12 1:24 PM
Initial Deadlines & Scheduling Conference reset by agreement of the parties: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/2/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/9/2024, Joint Status Report due by 8/16/2024, Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2024 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom B via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC) |
||
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Redacted DECLARATION of Jeff Clare filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer DeGross, Shane DeGross re13 MOTION to Dismiss (Widmalm-Delphonse, Johannes) |
|
22 | 22
![]() RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Jennifer DeGross, Shane DeGross, to13 MOTION to Dismiss . (Widmalm-Delphonse, Johannes) |
|
21 | 21
![]() DISREGARD, will re-filed RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Jennifer DeGross, Shane DeGross, to 13 MOTION to Dismiss .(Widmalm-Delphonse, Johannes) Modified on 6/10/2024 to strike at request of filer. (CDA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Notice of Docket Text Modification
Mon 06/10 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re21 Response to Motion. Entry stricken at request of filer, document will be re-filed. (CDA) |
||
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Judge Robert J. Bryan for consideration of all pending motions. The Clerk is directed to send uncertified copies of this Order to all counsel of record and to any party appearing pro se at said party's last known address. Authorized by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (AMD) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER granting17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time, to brief Defendant's13 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants' motion to dismiss by 6/10/2024, and Defendants shall file their reply brief no later than 6/24/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(AMD) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re17 Joint Stipulated MOTION for Extension |
|
17 | 17
![]() Joint Stipulated MOTION for Extension , filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 5/20/2024, |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Hernandez on behalf of Defendants Natalie Green, Ross Hunter, Ruben Reeves, Jeanine Tacchini. (Hernandez, Jennifer) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Madeline Jane Ebel on behalf of Defendants Natalie Green, Ross Hunter, Ruben Reeves, Jeanine Tacchini. (Ebel, Madeline) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() DECLARATION of Jeanine Tacchini filed by All Defendants re13 MOTION to Dismiss (Pavela, Marko) |
|
13 | 13
![]() MOTION to Dismiss , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 6/3/2024, (Pavela, Marko) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Natalie Green on 4/15/2024; Ross Hunter on 4/15/2024; Ruben Reeves on 4/15/2024; Jeanine Tacchini on 4/15/2024 (Widmalm-Delphonse, Johannes) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/2/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/9/2024, Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2024, Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2024 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom B via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 04/17 9:20 AM
Attorney Daniel J Judge and Carissa Ann Greenberg added for Natalie Green, Ross Hunter, Ruben Reeves, Jeanine Tacchini; per10 Notice of Appearance. (AMD) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marko Pavela on behalf of Defendants Natalie Green, Ross Hunter, Ruben Reeves, Jeanine Tacchini. (Pavela, Marko) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ross Hunter. (TE) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/26 12:54 PM
ORDER re3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan A Scruggs for PLAINTIFFS Jennifer DeGross and Shane DeGross, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/26 12:29 PM
ORDER re2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Johannes Widmalm-Delphonse for PLAINTIFFS Jennifer DeGross and Shane DeGross, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() PRAECIPE re3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() PRAECIPE re2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Natalie Green, Ross Hunter, Ruben Reeves, Jeanine Tacchini.(AMD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 03/25 10:30 AM
U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo added. (AMD) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan Scruggs FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8400915 |
|
2 | 2
![]() APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Johannes Widmalm-Delphonse FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8400894 |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Conrad Reynoldson added to party Jennifer DeGross(pty:pla), Attorney Conrad Reynoldson added to party Shane DeGross(pty:pla) filed by Shane DeGross, Jennifer DeGross. |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |