Makind USA, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Sheri Bluebond |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-12205 |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Debtor
Makind USA, Inc.
401 S Vermont Ave Ste 1
Los Angeles, CA 90020-1983 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
John P Pringle (TR)
Roquemore, Pringle & Moore, Inc. 13300 Crossroads Parkway North Suite 185
City of Industry, CA 91746 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 03/22/2024 12:03 PM PDT |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 03/22 9:59 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-12205] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56644443. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 03/22 9:47 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Makind USA, Inc. (Chang, Young) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Fri 03/22 10:04 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/19/2024 at 09:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Fri 03/22 10:11 AM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Makind USA, Inc.. (Chang, Young) |