New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: Sarah Netburn
Case #: 1:24-cv-02178
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
DeepMedia.A.I.
Represented By
Micah R Jacobs
Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud And Romo
contact info
Erik Leigh Wilson
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stonegardens Advisory LLC
115 Broadway, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Douglas J. Lutz
Wasserman Grubin & Rogers LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 12:17 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
45 45 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 04/28 7:27 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/9/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
44 44 misc Transcript Mon 04/28 7:26 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/9/2025 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 2:39 PM
ORDER: On Thursday, April 10, 2025, the Court issued an Order directing the parties to email Courtroom Deputy Diljah Shaw by April 17, 2025, to schedule a settlement conference. The parties have not contacted Ms. Shaw. No later than May 1, 2025, the parties are directed to e-mail Ms. Shaw at Diljah_Shaw@nysd.uscourts.gov with three mutually convenient dates to schedule a settlement conference. In light of the Court's busy calendar, settlement conferences must generally be scheduled at least six to eight weeks in advance. The Court will likely be unable to accommodate last-minute requests for settlement conferences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/24/2025) (dsh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
42 42 order Case Management Plan Thu 04/10 4:53 PM
REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case to be tried to a jury. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the Jan. 8, 2025 Order. Unless othe1wise indicated, the Case Management Conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681, and enter Access Code 2318-315-0661, followed by the pound(#) key. Counsel are directed to review the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, found at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-paul-engelmayer, for the Court's procedures for telephonic conferences and for instructions for communicating with chambers. Deposition due by 5/30/2025. Fact Discovery due by 5/30/2025. Expert Discovery due by 7/16/2025. Estimate length of trial 10 days. Telephone Conference set for 6/30/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/10/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
41 41 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/10 4:36 PM
ORDER: On April 9, 2025, the Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer assigned this matter to my docket for settlement. By April 17, 2025, the parties are directed to email Courtroom Deputy Diljah Shaw at Diljah_Shaw@nysd.uscourts.gov with three mutually convenient dates to schedule a settlement conference. Due to the Court's busy calendar, settlement conferences must generally be scheduled at least six to eight weeks in advance. The Court will likely be unable to accommodate last-minute requests for settlement conferences, and the parties should not anticipate that litigation deadlines will be adjourned in response to late requests for settlement conferences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/10/2025) (dsh)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Thu 04/10 3:48 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
39 39 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/09 2:15 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Counsel for defendant is directed to contact the Magistrate Judge's chambers to schedule a settlement conference on a mutually agreeable date at such time that the parties agree a conference would be useful. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/9/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
minutes Discovery Hearing Thu 04/10 11:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Discovery Hearing held on 4/9/2025. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defense counsel present. Court reporter present. (ajs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
38 38 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/01 12:14 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:37 Letter, filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court's judgment is that a conference is necessary. To accommodate counsel, the Court adjourns the in person discovery conference to Wednesday, April 9, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. EST. Counsel should be prepared to discuss any and all developments as to the status of discovery productions, including what has been produced since the parties' last joint letter dated March 31, 2025, what remains to be produced, and by when such productions will be completed, and with a concrete plan to complete fact discovery by April 30, 2025. SO ORDERED. ( Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2025., Status Conference set for 4/9/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/1/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
37 37 3 pgs misc Letter Mon 03/31 9:05 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Michael Rogers, Douglas Lutz, Micah Jacobs and Jon Ustundag dated March 31, 2025 re: Joint Letter of Discovery Dispute Status as per Court Endorsement - ECF Document No. 32. Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DM Position Ex. A - SGA Document Demand,
Att: 2 Exhibit DM Position Ex. B - SGA Interrogatory Response,
Att: 3 Exhibit DM Position Ex. C - Court appearance notices
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
36 36 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/27 9:54 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:35 Letter Discovery Dispute, filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is dismayed by plaintiff's report that substantial document discovery from defendant remains outstanding and that, according to defendant's counsel, its fact witnesses are unavailable until June 2025. That position is unsustainable. Fact discovery is scheduled to end on April 30, 2025, and the Court does not intend to move that deadline. At the January 6, 2025 initial pretrial conference, the Court reminded defendant of its discovery obligations, including as to the production of its articles of incorporation and financial valuations. Dkt. 26. And on March 21, 2025, the Court issued the parties' protective order in furtherance of securing any productions of confidential information. Dkt. 34. The Court expects both parties to abide by the deadlines set forth in the case management plan and scheduling order. Dkt. 26. The Court will give the parties one final chance to confer to attempt to resolve these issues without further judicial intervention, and to file a joint status update to that end by March 31, 2025. To the extent the parties continue to seek a discovery conference, the Court will schedule an in-person conference on April 4, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1305 at the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. In light of counsels' fractiousness during pretrial proceedings, the Court's judgment is a telephonic conference would not be workable. Counsel should come to the conference prepared to discuss the factual and legal bases for any discovery requests and objections, and with a concrete plan to complete fact discovery by April 30, 2025. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 4/4/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/26/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
35 35 misc Letter Fri 03/21 8:58 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Douglas Lutz dated March 21, 2025 re: Joint Letter of Discovery Dispute Status as per Court Endorsement - ECF Document No. 32. Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex.A- Deep Media 3-17-25 ltr to Stonegardens
34 34 order Protective Order Fri 03/21 4:50 PM
STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE PROTECTION OF CONFIDENTIAL AND PROPRIETARY INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/21/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Proposed Protective Order Fri 03/21 2:02 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
32 32 3 pgs order Memo Endorsement Wed 03/19 12:29 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:31 Letter filed by DeepMedia.A.I.. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this notification. Based on defense counsel's letter, it is not apparent that a live controversy remains. The Court directs the parties to meet and confer forthwith and to file a joint status update, due March 21, 2025, indicating whether the parties still request a discovery conference, and if so, setting out with specificity the issues which a meet-and-confer has failed to resolve. Henceforth, the Court expects counsel to follow its Individual Rules, and to meet and confer, prior to raising discovery disputes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/19/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
31 31 3 pgs misc Letter Mon 03/17 11:06 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Counsel for Defendant Deep Media, Inc. dated March 17, 2025 re: reply letter pursuant to Courts order (Dkt. 30). Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Thu 03/13 9:02 AM
ORDER with respect to29 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Defendant's reply is due March 17, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/12/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Local Rule 37.2 Conference Wed 03/12 11:47 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Douglas Lutz dated March 12, 2025. Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deep Media Written Document Demand Response,
Att: 2 Exhibit Stonegardens 2-27-25 letter to Deep Media detailing its discovery deficiencies,
Att: 3 Exhibit Stonegardens Written Interrogatory Response,
Att: 4 Exhibit Stonegardens Written Document Demand Response,
Att: 5 Exhibit Stonegardens 2-20-25 email with link producing over 41,000 pages
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 03/13 9:03 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 3/17/2025. (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
28 28 8 pgs discov Rule 26 Disclosure Tue 01/21 10:32 PM
RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
27 27 13 pgs discov Rule 26 Disclosure Tue 01/21 5:29 PM
RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Rogers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
26 26 order Case Management Plan Wed 01/08 4:28 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER:All parties do not consent to conducting all fu1iher proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than April 30, 2025. Depositions to be completed by April 30, 2025. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than June 16, 2025. Counsel for the patties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 10 days. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for May 29, 2025. Unless otherwise indicated, the Case Management Conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681, and enter Access Code 2318-315-0661, followed by the pound(#) key. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 4/30/2025. Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2025. Expert Discovery due by 6/16/2025. Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 03:00 PM in telephone or video conference before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/8/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
25 25 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/06 11:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
24 24 4 pgs misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 01/06 9:29 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
23 23 3 pgs misc Letter Mon 01/06 7:02 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Michael T. Rogers, Esq. and Micah R. Jacobs, Esq. (Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant dated January 6, 2025 re: Joint Letter in Advance of Initial Pretrial (Telephonic) Conference Scheduled for Wednesday, January 8, 2025. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah) (Entered: 01/06/2025)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/02 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Thomas Rogers on behalf of Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Rogers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/30 11:59 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT granting20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, (Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Micah R, Jacobs, Esq, dated December 23, 2024.. NOW, THEREFORE, based on the foregoing, the Parties request that the time within which Defendant must respond to the Complaint shall be extended by two weeks to, and including, January 6, 2025. GRANTED. Defendant Deep Media Inc.'s Answer is due January 6, 2025. The parties' civil case management plan and joint letter are now due January 6, 2025, in advance of the initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 8, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. See Dkt. 19. SO ORDERED. DeepMedia.A.I. answer due 1/6/2025. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/30/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/23 5:26 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, (Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Micah R, Jacobs, Esq, dated December 23, 2024. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I.. Return Date set for 1/6/2025 at 11:59 PM..(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 12/10 9:19 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681, and enter Access Code 2318-315-0661, followed by the pound(#) key. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/9/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
18 18 26 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 12/09 10:47 AM
OPINION AND ORDER re:7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Improer Venue or alternatively Forum Non Conveniens . filed by DeepMedia.A.I.,16 MOTION for Oral Argument Letter Request for Oral Argument . filed by DeepMedia.A.I.. For the foregoing reasons, the Court denies DeepMedia's motions to dismiss and to transfer venue. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Dockets 7 and 16. By separate order today, the Court will schedule an initial conference and a deadline for submission of a proposed case management plan that provides for the close of fact discovery by the end of April 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/9/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
17 17 1 pgs misc Letter Wed 08/14 1:56 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Micah R. Jacobs dated August 14, 2024 re: Fully Briefed Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
16 16 motion Oral Argument Tue 06/11 8:18 PM
MOTION for Oral Argument Letter Request for Oral Argument . Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/10 11:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Improer Venue or alternatively Forum Non Conveniens . . Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Rijul Gupta
Sunday, May 26, 2024
14 14 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Sun 05/26 2:21 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Improer Venue or alternatively Forum Non Conveniens . . Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Nicholas Angerame Submitted in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by Defendant DeepMedia.AI (Part A -- pp. 1-12),
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Nicholas Angerame Submitted in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by Defendant DeepMedia.AI (Part B -- pp. 13-23),
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex.1-Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex.2-DeepMedia-Stonegardens 2020 AgreementAmendment to 2020 Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex.3-Amendment to 2020 Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex.4-DeepMedia-Stonegardens 2022 Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex.5-Part A- DeepMedia NASIC Submission (coversheet and pp. 1-7),
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex.5-Part B- DeepMedia NASIC Submission (coversheet and pp. 8-157),
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex.6-Stonegardens website printout,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex.7-Compiliation of representative emails from Nicholas Angerame to DeepMedia,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex.8-Angerame emailt to DeepMedia, 7/1/23, 7/,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex.9-Stonegardens' invoices to DeepMedia,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex.10-DeepMedia "about-us" website printout,
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex.11-DeepMedia US-DoD Proposal Presentation, No. FX235-C201-2049,
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex.12-DeepMedia "our team" website printout,
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex.13-Emma Brown Linked-In page printout,
Att: 17 Exhibit Ex/14-Emma Brown resume,
Att: 18 Exhibit Ex.15-Singh-Mahli Linked-In page printout,
Att: 19 Exhibit Ex.16-Ryan Ofman Linked-In page printout,
Att: 20 Exhibit Ex.17-Daniel Gabardo Linked-In page printout,
Att: 21 Exhibit Ex.18-Yusen Wu Linked-In page printout,
Att: 22 Exhibit Ex.19-J. Vargas Arregoces Linked-In page printout,
Att: 23 Exhibit Ex.20-R. Le Calze Linked-In page printout,
Att: 24 Exhibit Ex.21-Elvia Guitierrez Linked-In page printout,
Att: 25 Exhibit Ex.22-Jakub Mularski Linked-In page printout,
Att: 26 Exhibit Ex.23-Accesswire announcement by DeepMedia,
Att: 27 Exhibit Ex.24-Gold Candor PR website printout,
Att: 28 Exhibit Ex.25-DeepMedia - AFRL(in NY) Contract,
Att: 29 Exhibit Ex.26-DeepMedia-University of Buffalo Teaming Contract,
Att: 30 Exhibit Ex.27-DeepMedia-Dan Donovan agreement,
Att: 31 Exhibit Ex.28-DeepMedia SBIR/STTR Submission,
Att: 32 Exhibit Ex.29-DocShare excerpt between DeepMedia and Stonegardens about DeepMedia's retention of NY PR firm,
Att: 33 Exhibit Ex.30-Kalman Sporn Linked-In page printout,
Att: 34 Exhibit Ex.31-Kalman Sporn-Algemeiner.com webpage printout,
Att: 35 Exhibit Ex.32-Deroy Murdock Letter of Support for DeepMedia,
Att: 36 Exhibit Ex.33-R. Gupta email to K. Spron and Stonegardens, 6/10/22,
Att: 37 Exhibit Ex.34-R. Gupta email to K. Spron and Stonegardens, 7/6/22,
Att: 38 Exhibit Ex.35-R. Gupta email to K. Sporn and Stonegardens, 7/12/22,
Att: 39 Exhibit Ex.36-R. Gupta email to Wall Street Journal reporter, S. Kalin
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/15 3:24 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSIONPRO HAC VICE granting12 Motion for Micah Rood Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Micah R. Jacobs, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/15/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/13 4:40 PM
MOTION for Micah Rood Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration iso Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 05/13 4:44 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 12 MOTION for Micah Rood Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/08 4:03 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Micah Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29329497. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Jacobs, Micah) Modified on 5/8/2024 (bc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Micah Jacobs in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Micah Jacobs,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/08 10:05 AM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by May 27, 2024. No further opportunities to amend will ordinarily be granted. If plaintiff does amend, by June 17, 2024 defendants shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) submit a letter to the Court, copying plaintiff, stating that they rely on the previously filed motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by May 26, 2024. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by June 10, 2024. At the time any reply is filed, the moving party shall supply the Court with two courtesy copies of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. DeepMedia.A.I. answer due 6/17/2024. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2024., Motions due by 6/17/2024., Responses due by 5/26/2024, Replies due by 6/10/2024.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/7/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/08 4:29 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 11 MOTION for Micah Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29329497. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/07 7:39 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Wilson, Erik)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/07 10:29 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Erik Leigh Wilson to RE-FILE Document No. 8 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here NYSD form page (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/06 9:46 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I...(Wilson, Erik)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 05/06 9:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Improer Venue or alternatively Forum Non Conveniens . Document filed by DeepMedia.A.I.. Responses due by 5/20/2024.(Wilson, Erik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Rijul Gupta in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 04/17 9:46 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. DeepMedia.A.I. served on 3/30/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. Service was accepted by Rijul Gupta (Authorized Agent/CEO). Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 03/25 9:12 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DeepMedia.A.I...(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 03/25 9:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Douglas J. Lutz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $940,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $940,000;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/25 9:10 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/25 9:11 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/25 9:11 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/22 3:21 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/22 3:15 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DeepMedia A.I. f/k/a Anonymous A.I. Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/22 3:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/22 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against DeepMedia.A.I. f/k/a Anonymous A.I. Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29119500)Document filed by Stonegardens Advisory LLC..(Lutz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2020 Agreement between Parties,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2021 Amendment to 2020 Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2022 Agreement between Parties