15
|
|
15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/18 3:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/18/2024. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
notice
Setting Letter
Thu 04/18 2:24 PM
NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: A Jury Trial has been set for Monday, March 24, 2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, February 28, 2025. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, March 7, 2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (smm)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/18 2:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: A Status/Scheduling Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 4/18/2024. Stephen T. Brown, III appeared for the plaintiff(s). William C. Frulla appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. A Jury Trial has been set for Monday, March 24, 2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, February 28, 2025. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, March 7, 2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter: Polly Wardlaw) (smm)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 4:52 PM
NOTICE by Vickie Harris Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Brown, Stephen)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/16 10:40 AM
NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Service of Defendants' Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Frulla, William)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Wed 04/10 1:39 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Order Submitted) . (Frulla, William)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Toof Brown, III on behalf of Vickie Harris (Brown, Stephen)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/05 1:30 PM
TEXT NOTICE RE-SETTING STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (CHANGE IN TIME ONLY): (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) The Status/Scheduling Conference has been re-set for Thursday, April 18, 2024 at 2:15 PM. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (CHANGE IN TIME ONLY) The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions. (smm)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Setting Letter - Teams
Mon 03/25 10:56 AM
TEXT NOTICE RE-SETTING STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (CHANGE IN TIME ONLY): (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) The Status/Scheduling Conference has been re-set for Thursday, April 18, 2024 at 2:45 PM. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (CHANGE IN TIME ONLY) The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions.(smm)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 1:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Investment, LLC, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.. (Frulla, William)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/22 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Fri 03/22 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
notice
ADR Compliance
Fri 03/22 12:56 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/22 12:54 PM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/22 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-4269-23 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4372781), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Frulla, William)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C
|