Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-10742
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Case in other court:22nd Judicial District Court, 24-000228-NF
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 6:29 AM EDT
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael W. Slater
Slater Seibert
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Gedda
Represented By
Stephen Jay Hulst
Rhoades Mckee PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
29 29 minutes Bench Order Order on Motion to Extend Mon 04/28 12:09 PM
Bench Order rendered at a hearing held on 4/28/2025 before District Judge Robert J. White: Denying24 Motion to Extend Discovery. (TEXT-ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED) (TVil)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Mon 04/28 12:08 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Robert J. White: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2025 re24 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Disposition: Motion denied. (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (TVil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
28 28 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 04/24 4:34 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Scott W. Malott appearing on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Malott, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
27 27 notice Hearing on Motion* Fri 04/11 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on24 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2025 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 02/20 1:44 PM
REPLY to Response re24 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Slater, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
25 25 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/13 3:23 PM
RESPONSE to24 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery filed by Matthew Gedda. (Hulst, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
24 24 motion Extend - free Thu 01/30 5:14 PM
MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Slater, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
minutes Status Conference Tue 01/28 2:29 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Robert J. White: Status Conference held on 1/28/2025. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TVil)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/28 2:31 PM
Set Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2025 at 1:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 11/12/2025 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
23 23 notice Appear* Thu 01/23 2:12 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 1/28/2025 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
22 22 order Protective Order Fri 12/13 1:31 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (THal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
21 21 notice Notice - Other Thu 12/05 12:29 PM
NOTICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to Withdraw Motion to Compel (Slater, Michael)
Related: [-]
20 20 trial Witness List Thu 12/05 11:54 AM
Amended WITNESS LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Slater, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Thu 12/05 12:18 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 12/6/24 is Cancelled re19 Re-Notice of Hearing on Motion. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
19 19 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 12/03 3:17 PM
RE-NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on13 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena . Motion Hearing reset for 12/6/2024 at 12:30 PM before District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 respm Response to Motion Wed 11/27 1:35 PM
RESPONSE to13 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed to Non-Party Jacqueline Serylo, PC filed by Matthew Gedda, Livingston Helping Hands, Inc., Jacqueline Serylo, PC. (Haley, Bridget)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Appearance Wed 11/27 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget Haley on behalf of Livingston Helping Hands, Inc., Jacqueline Serylo, PC. (Haley, Bridget)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Wed 11/27 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget Haley on behalf of Matthew Gedda. (Haley, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Fri 11/22 4:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 12/18/2024 is Cancelled re10 Notice to Appear. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
15 15 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 11/20 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on13 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena . Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2024 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
14 14 misc Report - Free Tue 11/19 1:42 PM
Voluntary Facilitative Mediation REPORT by All Parties (Behm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
13 13 motion Compel Wed 11/13 2:14 PM
MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Slater, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
12 12 notice Practice Guidelines Wed 10/23 2:04 PM
Notice of District Judge Robert J. White's Case Management Requirements. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
11 11 trial Witness List Fri 10/11 2:03 PM
WITNESS LIST by Matthew Gedda (Hulst, Stephen)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appear* Fri 10/11 10:26 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert J. White. Microsoft Teams link will be emailed to counsel. (TVil)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 10/11 9:58 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Robert J. White: Status Conference held on 10/11/2024. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TVil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
9 9 notice Appear* Thu 10/10 3:42 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 10/11/2024 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Robert J. White. Microsoft Teams link will be emailed to counsel. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
8 8 notice Appear* Thu 10/03 2:27 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 10/23/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert J. White. Microsoft Teams link will be emailed to counsel. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
7 7 trial Witness List Thu 09/26 3:02 PM
WITNESS LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Slater, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
order Text-Only Reassignment Mon 08/12 4:27 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge George Caram Steeh to District Judge Robert J. White pursuant to Administrative Order 24-AO-020. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
6 6 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/03 12:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/12/2024 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/10/2025 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. Related [+] (NAhm)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Thursday, May 30, 2024
5 5 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 05/30 3:56 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Slater, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
4 4 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 05/15 3:10 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hulst, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
order Text-Only Order Tue 04/16 2:28 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan by May 16, 2024. The Court will determine at that time if a Scheduling Conference will need to be set or will enter a Scheduling Order based off the Joint Discovery Plan. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/03 9:16 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Slater, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
2 2 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 03/28 10:59 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen Jay Hulst appearing on behalf of Matthew Gedda as Guardian for Stephen Gedda (Hulst, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 03/25 9:49 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Fri 03/22 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Washtenaw County Circuit Court, case number 24-000228-NF. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9722320 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Slater, Michael)
Related: [-]