Waitt et al v. Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory B Wormuth |
Referred: | Jerry H Ritter |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00284 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Twelfth Judicial District Court, D-1215-CV-24-00102 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 2:11 PM MDT |
Defendant
Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Waitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shanna Waitt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter SETTING a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for Tuesday, May 14, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Mountain Time. Counsel shall call Judge Ritter's AT&T conference line to connect to the proceeding: 888-278-0296 (access code: 9998216#). JSR and initial disclosures are due by Tuesday, May 7, 2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than Tuesday, April 30, 2024. (ama) | |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | |
Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (eh) | ||
United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (eh) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | ||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company from Twelfth Judicial District Court, case number D-1215-CV-2024-00102. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Comapny.(Allen, Meena) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9276726 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Comapny (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena) |