California Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas J Whelan
Referred: Allison H Goddard
Case #: 3:24-cv-00551
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 3:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Sky Harbour, LLC
Represented By
Terri L. Crawford
Clapp Moroney Vucinich Beeman & Scheley
contact info
Jeffrey J. White
Robinson&cole LLP
contact info
Joseph W. Strella, Jr.
Clapp, Moroney, Vucinich, Beeman & Scheley
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC
Represented By
Christine Joy Gracco
Law Offices Of Christine Joy Parsley
contact info
Timothy P. Dillon
Dillon Miller & Ahuja & Boss, LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 06 2025
ORDER Denying 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3). Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/6/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 05/08 10:53 AM
ORDER Setting Additional Early Nuetral Evaluation Conference and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 5/8/2025.(anh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
26 26 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Wed 05/07 5:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 5/7/2025. The case did not settle. Order to issue. (Plaintiff's Attorney Tim Dillon). (Defendant's Attorneys Jeff White; Sabrina Galli; Joseph Strella). (no document attached) (mxm2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
25 25 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 04/30 6:11 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dillon, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
24 24 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 04/16 3:51 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dillon, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
23 23 3 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Mon 04/14 3:59 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Sabrina M. Galli, re21 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/14/2025.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 04/10 12:54 PM
ANSWER to18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC.(Dillon, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
21 21 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 4:31 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19779190.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Galli, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
20 20 9 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 03/21 4:06 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference Via Videoconference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management set for 5/7/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 3/21/2025.(dim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
19 19 service Affidavit of Service Thu 03/20 11:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service of Answer, Defense and Counterclaim served on Counsel for all parties on March 20, 2025, filed by Sky Harbour, LLC. (Strella, Joseph)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 03/20 10:42 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Defenses and , COUNTERCLAIM against Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC by Sky Harbour, LLC.(Strella, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Supplier Agreement
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/06 3:58 PM
ORDER Denying8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3). Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/6/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
16 16 respm Sur-Reply Fri 07/12 3:25 PM
SUR-REPLY - re12 Reply to Response to Motion,15 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) filed by Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC. (Dillon, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Wed 07/03 10:08 AM
ORDER Granting14 Ex Parte Application to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/3/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
14 14 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Tue 06/25 6:16 PM
Ex Parte MOTION Plaintiff Application to File Sur-Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC.(Dillon, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sunjina Ahuja,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Monday, June 24, 2024
13 13 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 06/24 6:55 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Terri L. Crawford by Sky Harbour, LLC. (Crawford, Terri)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/24 2:02 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Improper Forum filed by Sky Harbour, LLC. (Strella, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/17 4:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Improper Forum filed by Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC.(Dillon, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, May 16, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 05/16 12:51 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffrey J. White, re9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 5/16/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
9 9 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/15 1:27 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18851639.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (White, Jeffrey) (exs)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Wed 05/15 1:04 PM
Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof(Strella, Joseph) (exs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Squiccimarro Declaration
Monday, May 13, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/13 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Strella, Jr on behalf of Sky Harbour, LLC (Strella, Joseph)Attorney Joseph W. Strella, Jr added to party Sky Harbour, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
6 6 misc Mail Returned Mon 05/06 2:27 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Christine Joy Gracco 608 Norwynn Lane Fallbrook, CA 92028. (exs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/22 1:30 PM
ORDER Granting3 4 Joint Motions for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint: Answer by Respondent due 5/17/2024. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/22/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/19 10:15 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Sky Harbour, LLC.(Crawford, Terri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Joint Stipulation of parties to extend time to file response to complaint
Thursday, April 18, 2024
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/18 2:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sky Harbour, LLC.(Crawford, Terri)Attorney Terri L. Crawford added to party Sky Harbour, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Joint Stipulation of Parties to Extend time to file response to complaint,
Att: 2 Notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel
Friday, March 22, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/22 2:02 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) (jms)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/22 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sky Harbour, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18696104.), filed by Lynk Remote Technologies, LLC. The new case number is 3:24-cv-551-W-AHG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Dillon, Timothy P)(axc1) (jms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet