GARCIA v. Walmart Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | James S Moody, Jr |
Referred: | Philip R Lammens |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00146 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court,5th Jud. Circuit, Lake County, 35-02024-CA-000102 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIELE CHAVEZ GARCIA
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/23 10:07 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Daniele Chavez Garcia |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/23 9:10 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Based on Plaintiff's Response at Docket 15, the Court dismisses the Complaint without prejudice to Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to separately file the Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/23/2024. (JG) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to motion
Mon 04/22 3:06 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Daniele Chavez Garcia. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Response
Mon 04/22 3:05 PM
RESPONSE re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Daniele Chavez Garcia. |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Mon 04/22 10:16 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a response to 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Failure to file a response by that time will result in the Court granting the motion as unopposed as stated in Local Rule 3.01(c). Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/22/2024. (SMB) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 03/28 10:09 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Walmart Inc.. (Sparks, Derek) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/28 10:06 AM
NOTICE by DANIELE CHAVEZ GARCIA Pendency of Other Actions |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 03/28 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason S. Remer on behalf of DANIELE CHAVEZ GARCIA. Lead Counsel: Jason S. Remer. |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/28 9:19 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 7 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Daniele Chavez Garcia. Modified docket text on 3/28/2024 (JOS) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/27 3:47 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/27 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/26 6:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Walmart Inc.. (Sparks, Derek) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 03/26 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lorena Blanco on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Blanco, Jennifer) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 03/26 3:03 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Walmart Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sparks, Derek) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 03/26 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Derek H. Sparks on behalf of Walmart Inc.. Lead Counsel: Derek H. Sparks. (Sparks, Derek) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/25 4:12 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:24-cv-146-JSM-PRL. (TNP) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/22 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit in and for Lake County, Florida, case number 35-2024-CA-000102 filed in State Court on January 17, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21902259 filed by Walmart Inc..(Sparks, Derek) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Composite B - Docket Sheet and State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |