Ariza v. SkyGroup Investments, LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory A Presnell |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00565 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
SkyGroup Investments, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Victor Ariza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 11:55 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SkyGroup Investments, LLC. (Young, Kevin) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Interested Persons Order
Fri 04/12 8:22 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/26/2024. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/12/2024. (AKC) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/11 4:00 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SkyGroup Investments, LLC answer or response due 5/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 4/11/2024. (MKH) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Thu 04/11 10:32 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by SkyGroup Investments, LLC.(Young, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/11 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kevin Michael Young on behalf of SkyGroup Investments, LLC. Lead Counsel: Kevin M. Young. (Young, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 04/04 4:20 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Victor Ariza. Related case(s): Yes (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Interested Persons Order by Victor Ariza. (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 03/28 5:41 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/27/2024 by Victor Ariza as to SkyGroup Investments, LLC. (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 03/26 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Victor Ariza. Lead Counsel: Roderick V. Hannah, Esq. (Hannah, Roderick) Modified on 3/26/2024 (CTR) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons issued
Tue 03/26 12:01 PM
SUMMONS issued as to SkyGroup Investments, LLC. (LNR) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 03/26 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Interested Persons Order
Mon 03/25 12:25 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days. A case management report will be required in this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/25/2024. (AKC) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/22 4:13 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-565-GAP-LHP. (TNP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT against SkyGroup Investments, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21901216) filed by Victor Ariza.(Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |