Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Indira Talwani |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10750 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 5:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Tue 04/09 5:18 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE 6 . (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
8 | 8
order
Protective Order
Tue 04/09 5:18 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
7 | 7
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 04/09 2:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Willianson, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Paige | ||
6 | 6
motion
Discovery
Tue 04/09 2:20 PM
MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/25 11:20 AM
Summons Issued as to John Doe. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 03/25 10:49 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report on the filing/termination of copyright case
Fri 03/22 4:47 PM
REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case .(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 4:46 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/22 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10331386 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |